EP2042640 - Container comprising a soapnut chamber [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aktiebolaget Electrolux St. Göransgatan 143 105 45 Stockholm / SE | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szabó, Levente Bük Kossuth u.36 9737 Budapest / HU | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Nardoni, Andrea Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Nardoni, Andrea Electrolux Italia S.p.A. Corso Lino Zanussi, 30 33080 Porcia (PN) / IT | ||
Former [2009/14] | Bodin, Henrik AB Electrolux Group Intellectual Property 105 45 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 08016829.7 | 25.09.2008 | [2009/14] | Priority number, date | SE20070002148 | 26.09.2007 Original published format: SE 0702148 | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2042640 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | D06F39/02 | [2009/14] | CPC: |
D06F39/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Title | German: | Behälter mit einer Kammer für Waschnüsse | [2009/14] | English: | Container comprising a soapnut chamber | [2009/14] | French: | Conteneur avec un compartement pour des noix de lavage | [2009/14] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 23.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/36] | 29.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.10.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]GB2074613 (THOMSON BRANDT) [X] 1-4,6-9 * page 1, line 89 - page 3, line 82; figures 1,2 *; | [X]GB2260770 (ZANUSSI ELETTRODOMESTICI [IT]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph L - page 5, paragraph 1; figure . *; | [X]EP1479813 (AWECO APPLIANCE SYS GMBH & CO [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,5,7 * page 6, paragraph 36 - page 7, paragraph 39; figure 3 *; | [X]DE10049316 (HENKEL KGAA [DE]) [X] 1,2,4,7 * abstract * * column 2, paragraphs 6-8 * * column 4, paragraph 24 - column 6, paragraph 31; figure - *; | [X]US2007022788 (CHOI DONG H [KR], et al) [X] 1,4,5,7 * page 2, paragraph 34 - page 3, paragraph 40; figure - *; | [A]DE202006015106U (CARSTENSEN DIRK [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006007741 (THOENY ROLF [CH]) [A] 1,2,4,5,7 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 1 - page 2, paragraph L *; | [A]DE202007003185U (LOEFFLER GUDRUN [DE]) [A] 1,7 * the whole document *; | [PA]DE202007006615U (KAMMERER VOLKER [DE]) [PA] 1,2,4,5,7 * the whole document * |