EP2016863 - Toothbrush head [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.04.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Gillette Company One Gillette Park- 3E Boston, MA 02127 / US | [2017/25] |
Former [2012/23] | For all designated states The Gillette Company One Gillette Park- 3E Boston, MA 02127 / US | ||
Former [2009/04] | For all designated states The Gillette Company Prudential Tower Building Boston, Massachusetts 02199 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Brown, William R., Jr. 6 Gemma Drive Peabody, MA 01960 / US | 02 /
Christman, Thomas A. 5 Maple Street Lexington MA 02420 / US | 03 /
Depuydt, Joseph A. 129 Maple Street Scituate, MA 02066 / US | 04 /
Duff, Ronald R., Jr. 9 Weagle Farm Road Shrewsbury MA 01545 / US | 05 /
Mangan, Edward J. 170 Concord Street Ashland, MA 01721 / US | 06 /
Braun, Phillip M. 128 Beechwood Hill Trail Exeter RI 02822 / US | 07 /
Claire-Zimmet, Karen 41 Shirley Road Waltham MA 02452 / US | 08 /
Zimmet, Helge 41 Shirley Road Waltham MA 02452 / US | 09 /
Deng, Joanna Q. 342 Harvard Street Brookline MA 02446 / US | 10 /
Majthan, Rudolf In der Weingarten 172A 65760 Eschborn / DE | 11 /
Hans, Rainer Weg am Wehrholz 14 65529 Waldems / DE | [2010/01] |
Former [2009/04] | 01 /
Brown, William R., Jr. 6 Gemma Drive Peabody, MA 01960 / US | ||
02 /
Christman, Thomas A. 5 Maple Street Lexington MA 02420 / US | |||
03 /
Depuydt, Joseph A. 65 Longwood Road Quincy MA 02169 / US | |||
04 /
Duff, Ronald R., Jr. 9 Weagle Farm Road Shrewsbury MA 01545 / US | |||
05 /
Mangan, Edward J. 16 Rockpoint Road Southborough MA 01772 / US | |||
06 /
Braun, Phillip M. 128 Beechwood Hill Trail Exeter RI 02822 / US | |||
07 /
Claire-Zimmet, Karen 41 Shirley Road Waltham MA 02452 / US | |||
08 /
Zimmet, Helge 41 Shirley Road Waltham MA 02452 / US | |||
09 /
Deng, Joanna Q. 342 Harvard Street Brookline MA 02446 / US | |||
10 /
Majthan, Rudolf In der Weingarten 172A 65760 Eschborn / DE | |||
11 /
Hans, Rainer Weg am Wehrholz 14 65529 Waldems / DE | Representative(s) | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/43] | Töpert, Verena Clarita Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Frankfurter Str. 145 61476 Kronberg im Taunus / DE | ||
Former [2012/47] | Töpert, Verena Clarita, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH Patent Department Berliner Allee 65 64274 Darmstadt / DE | ||
Former [2012/36] | Schneider, Stefan Michael, et al Braun GmbH Patent Department Frankfurterstrasse 145 61476 Kronberg / DE | ||
Former [2012/24] | Richards, John, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/04] | Ebner von Eschenbach, Jennifer, et al Ladas & Parry LLP Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08016869.3 | 09.03.2004 | [2009/04] | Priority number, date | US20030389448 | 14.03.2003 Original published format: US 389448 | [2009/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2016863 | Date: | 21.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2016863 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | [2011/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2016863 | Date: | 21.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2011 | Classification | IPC: | A46B7/06, A46B9/04, A46B9/06 | [2009/04] | CPC: |
A46B9/04 (EP,KR,US);
A46B3/16 (EP,US);
A46B5/002 (EP,US);
A46B5/0025 (EP,US);
A46B7/06 (EP,KR,US);
A46B9/025 (EP,US);
A46B9/06 (EP,US);
A61C17/3481 (EP,US);
B29C45/0055 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/25] |
Former [2009/04] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zahnbürstenkopf | [2009/04] | English: | Toothbrush head | [2009/04] | French: | Tête de brosse à dents | [2009/04] | Examination procedure | 20.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/04] | 19.08.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04718812.3 / EP1603426 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20040718812) is 17.01.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 06.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 07.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 14 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.03.2004 | AT | 21.06.2017 | CY | 21.06.2017 | CZ | 21.06.2017 | DK | 21.06.2017 | EE | 21.06.2017 | ES | 21.06.2017 | FI | 21.06.2017 | MC | 21.06.2017 | PL | 21.06.2017 | PT | 21.06.2017 | RO | 21.06.2017 | SE | 21.06.2017 | SI | 21.06.2017 | SK | 21.06.2017 | BG | 21.09.2017 | GR | 22.09.2017 | IE | 09.03.2018 | LU | 09.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 09.03.2004 | |
AT | 21.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
PT | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
IE | 09.03.2018 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
LU | 09.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
MC | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
DK | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
ES | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
PL | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 21.06.2017 | |
CZ | 21.06.2017 | ||
EE | 21.06.2017 | ||
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
RO | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
SK | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 21.06.2017 | |
FI | 21.06.2017 | ||
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | FI | 21.06.2017 | |
SE | 21.06.2017 | ||
BG | 21.09.2017 | ||
GR | 22.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4449266 (NOERTHEMANN KARL-HEINZ [DE], et al) [X] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US4938539 (BARMAN ROLF [NO]) [X] 1-13* the whole document *; | [X]WO0133994 (BARMAN ROLF [NO]) [X] 1-13 * the whole document * | by applicant | US4635313 | EP0676268 | GB2330791 | US6018840 | US6058541 | US6361120 | JP19910312978 |