EP2036749 - Air conditioning and ventilation system for a motor vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR, GB | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft Berliner Ring 2 38440 Wolfsburg / DE | [2012/28] |
Former [2009/12] | For all designated states Volkswagen Aktiengesellschaft 38436 Wolfsburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schulze, Werner, Dr. Maschwiesen 3 38531 Rötgesbüttel / DE | 02 /
Meyer, Manfred Bauernende 3 38474 Tülau / DE | 03 /
Brück, Stefan Bleicheroder Strasse 5 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | [2009/20] |
Former [2009/12] | 01 /
Schulze, Werner, Dr. Maschwiesen 3 38531 Rötgesbüttel / DE | ||
02 /
Meyer, Manfred Bauernende 3 38474 Tülau / DE | |||
03 /
Brück, Stefan Kampstrasse 3 38442 Wolfsburg / DE | Representative(s) | Pohlmann, Bernd Michael RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Rossmarkt 12 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/34] | Pohlmann, Bernd Michael Reinhardt & Pohlmann Patentanwälte Rossmarkt 12 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | ||
Former [2009/12] | Pohlmann, Bernd Michael Reinhardt & Pohlmann Patentanwälte Rossmarkt 12 60311 Frankfurt am Main / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017374.3 | 09.11.2001 | [2009/12] | Priority number, date | DE2000155670 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055670 | DE2000155672 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055672 | DE2000155669 | 10.11.2000 Original published format: DE 10055669 | [2009/12] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2036749 | Date: | 18.03.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2036749 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B60H1/22, B60H1/00 | [2009/12] | CPC: |
B60H1/2225 (EP);
B60H1/00064 (EP);
B60H1/00564 (EP);
B60H1/00842 (EP);
B60H2001/00128 (EP);
B60H2001/002 (EP);
B60H2001/2287 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [2009/12] | Title | German: | Klima- und Belüftungsanlage für ein Kraftfahrzeug | [2009/12] | English: | Air conditioning and ventilation system for a motor vehicle | [2009/12] | French: | Installation de climatisation et d'aération pour un véhicule automobile | [2009/12] | Examination procedure | 18.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/44] | 15.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.02.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2013 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 21.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01126776.2 / EP1205321 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010126776) is 07.08.2007 | Opposition(s) | 22.05.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 30.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.08.2013 | IT | 21.08.2013 | GB | 21.11.2013 | FR | 02.12.2013 | [2014/51] |
Former [2014/24] | ES | 21.08.2013 | |
IT | 21.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE19811548 (VALEO CLIMATISATION SA [FR]) [X] 1,5-10 * the whole document * [Y] 2-4; | [Y]DE19708383 (HELLA KG HUECK & CO [DE]) [Y] 2-4 * column 6, line 67 - column 7, line 50; figure 1 *; | [X]US4665971 (SAKURAI YOSHIHIKO [JP]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 56 - column 4, line 34; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3820431 (NISSAN MOTOR [JP]) [X] 1 * page 5, line 38 - page 6, line 40; figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE19646123 (BEHR GMBH & CO [DE]) [A] 1-10; | [A]FR2659908 (RENAULT [FR]) [A] 7 * abstract * | by applicant | DE19646123 |