EP2045550 - Refrigerator and/or freezer device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Hausgeräte Ochsenhausen GmbH Memminger Strasse 77 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oelmaier, Klaus In den Grenzen 17 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | 02 /
Laube, Viktor Längenmoos 6 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017408.9 | 02.10.2008 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | DE20072013945U | 05.10.2007 Original published format: DE 202007013945 U | DE20072014887U | 26.10.2007 Original published format: DE 202007014887 U | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2045550 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2045550 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.06.2015 | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/00, F25D19/02 | [2015/11] | CPC: |
F25D23/003 (EP,US);
F25D19/02 (EP,US);
F25D2321/1411 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/15] | F25D23/00 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2016/11] |
Former [2009/15] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Kühl- und oder Gefriergerät | [2009/15] | English: | Refrigerator and/or freezer device | [2009/15] | French: | Appareil de réfrigération et ou de refroidissement | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/27] | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/27] | 17.02.2016 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2015 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2885142 (EBERHART ARTHUR H) [X] 2 * column 3, lines 57-69 * [Y] 3 [I] 4-18; | [XI]US5848536 (DODGE DAVID [US], et al) [X] 2 * column 1, lines 36-39 * * column 5, lines 9-20 *[I] 4-18; | [XYI]US2003121275 (ERISGEN SUKRU [US]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0008]; figures 1, 2 * [Y] 3 [I] 4-18 | by applicant | DE10235487 |