EP2083452 - High concentration terrestrial solar cell arrangement with III-V compound semiconductor cell [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.09.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.09.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 26.10.2011 [2011/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Emcore Solar Power, Inc. 10420 Research Road SE Albuquerque NM 87123 / US | [2009/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aiken, Daniel J. 13 Mulberry Loop Cedar Crest NM 87007 / US | 02 /
Stan, Mark A 9402 Del Arroya NE Albuquerque NM 87122 / US | 03 /
Newman, Fred 1100 Madison St. SE Albuquerque NM 87108 / US | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/31] | Wagner, Karl H. Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017412.1 | 02.10.2008 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | US20080020283 | 25.01.2008 Original published format: US 20283 | US20080148553 | 18.04.2008 Original published format: US 148553 | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2083452 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/068, H01L31/0304, H01L31/18, H01L31/0224 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
H01L31/1852 (EP,US);
H01L31/022425 (EP,US);
H01L31/03042 (EP,US);
H01L31/0687 (EP,US);
H01L31/0693 (EP,US);
Y02E10/52 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2010/14] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Terrestrische Hochkonzentrations-Solarzellenanordnung mit III-V-Verbundhalbleiterzelle | [2009/31] | English: | High concentration terrestrial solar cell arrangement with III-V compound semiconductor cell | [2009/31] | French: | Agencement de cellule solaire terrestre à forte concentration avec une cellule à semi-conducteur de composé III-V | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 13.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 30.01.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 17.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/43] | 10.06.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2011/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2010 | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5217539 (FRAAS LEWIS M [US], et al) [Y] 1-10 * column 4, lines 27-58 * * column 9, lines 35-44 * * column 9, line 60 - column 10, line 2; figures 2,4,11 *; | [A]US2002117675 (MASCARENHAS ANGELO [US]) [A] 1,7 * paragraphs [0006] , [0007] , [0017] , [0034] - [0039] - [0064] - [0070]; figures 1-5 *; | [A]EP1469528 (BOEING CO [US]) [A] 1,6-10 * paragraphs [0019] - [0023] - [0036] - [0040] - [0044] , [0047] , [0048] , [0050] , [0060] - [0065] - [0079] - [0083] - [0086] , [0087]; figures 1,4-6 *; | [A]KR20030002105 (KWANGJU INST SCI & TECH [KR]) [A] 1,6,7,9 * abstract * * page 2, paragraph 7 * * page 2, "the description" - page 3, "Details of the Invention" * * page 4, paragraph 2 - page 5, paragraph 2 * * page 5, paragraph 3 - page 6, paragraph 2 * * page 6, paragraph 5; figures 2a-2d,4 *; | [A]US3811954 (LINDMAYER J) [A] 3-5 * column 3, line 18 - column 4, line 19 * * column 5, lines 33-47; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US4521801 (KATO TAKETOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 2,3,5 * column 5, lines 25-47; figures 11,12 *; | [A]US2003178057 (FUJII SHUICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0027] , [0041] - [0043] - [0083] - [0088] - [0101] , [0102]; figure 1 *; | [PA]US7381886 (AIKEN DANIEL J [US], et al) [PA] 1 * column 1, line 20 - column 2, line 41 * * column 4, lines 33-42; figure 1 *; | [A]ITMI20071833 (EMCORE CORP) [A] 1; | [A]US3589946 (TARNEJA KRISHAN S, et al) [A] 2,5 * column 1, lines 14-17 * * column 1, lines 65-72 * * column 2, line 44 - column 3, line 10 * * column 3, lines 42-67 * * column 4, lines 37-43; figures 1-3 * | [Y] - KING R R ET AL, High-efficiency space and terrestrial multijunction solar cells through bandgap control in cell structures, CONFERENCE RECORD OF THE 29TH IEEE PHOTOVOLTAIC SPECIALISTS CONFERENCE 20020519; 20020519 - 20020524 NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, PAGE(S) 776 - 781, (20020519), ISBN 978-0-7803-7471-3, XP010666348 [Y] 1-10 * abstract; Introduction; Results and Discussion: "Top and middle cell bandgaps", first paragraph; page 779, lh column, par. 3 - page 780, lh column, first par.; "Wide-Bandgap Tunnel Junctions"; "High-Efficiency Solar Cells"; "Conclusions" * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/PVSC.2002.1190685 |