EP2048468 - Remote control unit for machine guns [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.09.2017 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.10.2017 [2017/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüß / DE | [2013/49] |
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Dr.-Hell-Strasse 24107 Kiel / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Riel, Markus Jenaer Straße 7 86169 Augsburg / DE | 02 /
Mattern, Siegfried Stadtberger Straße 63b 86157 Augsburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | 01 /
van Riel, Markus Jenaer Strasse 7 86169 Augsburg / DE | ||
02 /
Mattern, Siegfried Stadtberger Strasse 63b 86157 Augsburg / DE | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017440.2 | 04.10.2008 | [2009/16] | Priority number, date | DE20071048293 | 08.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007048293 | DE20081025499 | 28.05.2008 Original published format: DE102008025499 | [2009/16] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2048468 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2048468 | Date: | 23.05.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.04.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F41A19/08, // F41A17/06 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
F41A17/06 (EP);
F41A19/08 (EP);
F41A19/59 (EP);
H01F7/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/16] | Title | German: | Ferngesteuerte Bedienung von Maschinenwaffen/-gewehren | [2009/16] | English: | Remote control unit for machine guns | [2009/16] | French: | Commande télécommandée d'armes/de mitrailleuses automatiques | [2009/16] | Examination procedure | 23.11.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2012 | Examination requested [2013/01] | 19.03.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.08.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/41] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/41] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.03.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2007204745 (SON TAE-JIN [KR], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0034]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,3; | [YA]US5523684 (ZIMMERMANN DANIEL E [US]) [Y] 2,3 * the whole document * [A] 5-8; | [A]DE19731381 (LEIBER HEINZ [DE]) [A] 2,3,5-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5353680 (TIOMKIN MICHAEL [IL], et al) [A] 1 * column 10, line 57 - column 11, line 7; figures 14a,14b,15a,15b *; | [A]US5327810 (SANDUSKY HAROLD W [US], et al) [A] 1 * column 2, line 31 - line 57; figure 1 *; | [AD]DE10215910 (RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [AD]DE10204292 (RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1 * the whole document *; | [ADP]DE102007011591 (RHEINMETALL LANDSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [ADP] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE10215910 | DE10204292 |