EP2048341 - Control for internal combustion engine provided with cylinder deactivating mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/16] | Control for internal combustion engine provided with cylinder halting mechanism | ||
[2010/44] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.04.2012 [2012/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2011/20] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Honda Motor Co., Ltd. 1-1, Minami-Aoyama, 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | ||
Former [2009/16] | For all designated states HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD. 1-1, Minamiaoyama 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 107-8556 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Murakami, Akira c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 02 /
Endo, Taro c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | 03 /
Fukusako, Takaaki c/o Honda R&D Co., Ltd. 4-1, Chuo 1-chome Wako-shi Saitama, 351-0193 / JP | [2009/16] | Representative(s) | Prechtel, Jörg, et al C/o Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Richard-Strauss-Straße 80 81679 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/16] | Prechtel, Jörg, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017553.2 | 07.10.2008 | [2009/16] | Priority number, date | JP20070262980 | 09.10.2007 Original published format: JP 2007262980 | [2009/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2048341 | Date: | 15.04.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2048341 | Date: | 18.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F02D41/00, F02D17/02, // F02D41/40 | [2009/16] | CPC: |
F02D41/0087 (EP,US);
F02D17/02 (EP,US);
F02D2250/21 (EP,US);
F02D41/405 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [2009/52] |
Former [2009/16] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerung für einen Verbrennungsmotor mit einem Zylinderabschaltmechanimus | [2010/44] | English: | Control for internal combustion engine provided with cylinder deactivating mechanism | [2010/44] | French: | Contrôle de moteur à combustion interne fourni avec un mécanisme de désactivation du cylindre | [2010/44] |
Former [2009/16] | Steuerung für einen Verbrennungsmotor mit einem Zylinderrückhaltemechanimus | ||
Former [2009/16] | Control for internal combustion engine provided with cylinder halting mechanism | ||
Former [2009/16] | Contrôle de moteur à combustion interne fourni avec un mécanisme d'arrêt du cylindre | Examination procedure | 07.10.2008 | Examination requested [2009/16] | 16.10.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.11.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]JP2000170560 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [DA] 1-8 * abstract *; | [A]US7143727 (WINSTEAD VINCE [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 48 - column 9, line 28 * * figure - *; | [A]US2007175439 (BAUMANN ANDREAS [US], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0005] - [0011] *; | [A]US4337740 (SUGASAWA FUKASHI, et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5099816 (OHGA MUNEYUKI [JP], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003089102 (COLIGNON CHRISTOPHE [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2000170560 | JP2005105869 |