Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8204292 | Global Dossier | 19.06.2012 | B2 | US2009290779 | 26.11.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US24613008 | 06.10.2008 | US5490808 | 21.05.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2124191 | Global Dossier | 21.08.2013 | A3 | EP2124191 | 25.11.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US24613008 | 06.10.2008 | US5490808 | 21.05.2008 |