EP2124191 - Feature based neural network regression for feature suppression [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.09.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Riverain Medical Group, LLC 3020 South Tech Boulevard Miamisburg, OH 45342-4860 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Knapp, Jason c/o Riverain Medical Group, LLC 3020 South Tech Blvd. Miamisburg, Ohio 45342-4860 / US | 02 /
Worrell, Steve c/o Riverain Medical Group, LLC 3020 South Tech Blvd. Miamisburg, Ohio 45342-4860 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Lenzing Gerber Stute PartG von Patentanwälten m.b.B. Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/09] | Lenzing Gerber Stute Partnerschaft von Patentanwälten Bahnstrasse 9 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | LENZING GERBER Patentanwälte Postfach 20 05 09 40103 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017626.6 | 08.10.2008 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | US20080054908P | 21.05.2008 Original published format: US 54908 P | US20080246130 | 06.10.2008 Original published format: US 246130 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2124191 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2124191 | Date: | 21.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/00, // G06T5/50 | [2013/34] | CPC: |
G06T7/0012 (EP,US);
G06T5/50 (EP,US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/143 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10116 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20064 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/48] | G06T7/00, // G06T5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | Merkmalsgestützte Regression in einem neuronalen Netz zur Merkmalsunterdrückung | [2009/48] | English: | Feature based neural network regression for feature suppression | [2009/48] | French: | Régression de réseau neural basée sur les propriétés pour la suppression de propriétés | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/41] | 29.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.11.2013 | 06   M06   Not yet paid | 31.10.2014 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2002054694 (VACHTSEVANOS GEORGE J [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,16-18,20-25 * abstract * * paragraph [0004] - paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0189] * [A] 3,10-15,19,26-31; | [A]US2006039593 (SAMMAK PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-31 * the whole document *; | [A] - ETEMAD K ET AL, "SEPARABILITY-BASED MULTISCALE BASIS SELECTION AND FEATURE EXTRACTION FOR SIGNAL AND IMAGE CLASSIFICATION", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON IMAGE PROCESSING, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, PISCATAWAY, NJ, US, (199810), vol. 7, no. 10, doi:10.1109/83.718485, ISSN 1057-7149, pages 1453 - 1465, XP000782313 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/83.718485 | [A] - YU S ET AL, "FEATURE SELECTION USING GENERAL REGRESSIOMN NEURAL NETWORKS FOR THE AUTOMATIC DETECTION OF CLUSTERED MICROCALCIFICATIONS", 1999 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING. PHOENIX, AZ, MARCH 15 - 19, 1999; [IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON ACOUSTICS, SPEECH, AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICASSP)], NEW YORK, NY : IEEE, US, (19990315), ISBN 978-0-7803-5042-7, pages 1101 - 1104, XP000900317 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | [A] - VEGA-CORONA A ET AL, "Contextual and Non-Contextual Features Extraction and a Selection Method for Microcalcifications Detection", WORLD AUTOMATION CONGRESS, 2006. WAC '06, IEEE, PI, (200607), doi:10.1109/WAC.2006.375924, ISBN 978-1-889335-33-9, pages 1 - 6, XP031183132 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/WAC.2006.375924 | [A] - DENG-CHAO FENG ET AL, Texture Image Segmentation Based on Improved Wavelet Neural Network, ADVANCES IN NEURAL NETWORKS Â ISNN 2007; [LECTURE NOTES IN COMPUTER SCIENCE;;LNCS], SPRINGER BERLIN HEIDELBERG, BERLIN, HEIDELBERG, PAGE(S) 869 - 876, (20070603), ISBN 978-3-540-72394-3, XP019093684 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | [A] - EGMONT-PETERSEN M ET AL, "Image processing with neural networks-a review", PATTERN RECOGNITION, ELSEVIER, GB, (200210), vol. 35, no. 10, doi:10.1016/S0031-3203(01)00178-9, ISSN 0031-3203, pages 2279 - 2301, XP004366785 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0031-3203(01)00178-9 | [A] - WANG J ET AL, "WAVELET-BASED FEATURE-ADAPTIVE ADAPTIVE RESONANCE THEORY NEURAL NETWORK FOR TEXTURE IDENTIFICATION", JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC IMAGING, SPIE / IS & T, (199707), vol. 6, no. 3, doi:10.1117/12.269902, ISSN 1017-9909, pages 329 - 336, XP000704798 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.269902 | [A] - FORTHOFFER M ET AL, "DETECTION DE CONTOURS PAR TRANSFORMEE EN ONDELETTES ET RESEAUX DE NEURONES. \EDGEDETECTION USING WAVELET TRANSFORM AND NEURAL NETWORKS", TRAITEMENT DU SIGNAL, CENTRALE DES REVUES, MONTROUGE, FR, (199101), vol. 8, no. 6, ISSN 0765-0019, pages 431 - 440, XP000360601 [A] 1-31 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6549646 |