EP2053228 - Bolt boss of a piston [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.05.2021 Database last updated on 21.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 01.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 16.06.2021 [2021/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KS Kolbenschmidt GmbH Karl-Schmidt-Strasse 74172 Neckarsulm / DE | [2009/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Weiss, Eberhard Amselweg 6 74243 Langenbrettach / DE | 02 /
Müller, Gregor Wingerstrasse 45 68199 Mannheim / DE | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Greif, Thomas, et al Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [2013/32] |
Former [2009/18] | Thul, Hermann Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017698.5 | 09.10.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | DE20071050516 | 23.10.2007 Original published format: DE102007050516 | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2053228 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2053228 | Date: | 10.12.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F02F3/00, F16J1/02 | [2014/50] | CPC: |
F02F3/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/18] | F02F3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/29] |
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bolzennabe eines Kolbens | [2009/18] | English: | Bolt boss of a piston | [2009/18] | French: | Bossage d'axe d'un piston | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 03.06.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2015 | Examination requested [2015/29] | 29.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.07.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.11.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.07.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/24] | 19.09.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.05.2020 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 09.06.2020 | 09.06.2020 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.01.2021 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 21.01.2021 | 21.01.2021 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 29.01.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 08.02.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/24] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.11.2017 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 19.09.2019 | Request for further processing filed | 19.09.2019 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 03.10.2019 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 25.07.2018 | Request for further processing filed | 25.07.2018 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 09.08.2018 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 21.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 25.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 24.10.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 25.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS56167831 (YANMAR DIESEL ENGINE CO) [A] 1* abstract *; | [A]EP0182034 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [X]EP0270139 (KOLBENSCHMIDT AG [DE]) [X] 1-8 * column 2, line 41 - line 44 * * column 2, line 9 - column 3, line 46; figure - *; | [A]DE19837596 (KS KOLBENSCHMIDT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * | Examination | JPS59120755 | by applicant | DE3609019 | EP0270139 | DE3840841 | DE19837596 |