EP2063215 - Ammunition or projectile for illuminating a battlefield [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.11.2015 Database last updated on 30.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.07.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 22.08.2018 [2018/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Waffe Munition GmbH Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2 29345 Unterlüss / DE | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Aumund-Kopp, Ralf Otto-Fuhrhop-Weg 6 21335 Lüneburg / DE | 02 /
Dau, Ole Habichtweg 11 21391 Reppenstedt / DE | 03 /
Münzner, Sebastian Hans-Olde-Weg 46 24229 Dänischenhagen / DE | 04 /
Naderhoff, Uwe Schulz-Kamp 18 29328 Faßberg-Müden / DE | 05 /
Schwenzer, Michael Turnerstraße 32 29320 Hermannsburg / DE | 06 /
Thape, Manfred Fuhrenkämpe 24 29556 Suderburg / DE | 07 /
Rybol, Martin Dörnbergerstraße 53 29223 Celle / DE | 08 /
Sackarndt, Alfons Wiesengrund 3 29556 Suderburg / DE | [2014/46] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
Aumund-Kopp, Ralf Otto-Fuhrhop-Weg 6 21335 Lüneburg / DE | ||
02 /
Dau, Ole Habichtweg 11 21391 Reppenstedt / DE | |||
03 /
Münzner, Sebastian Hans-Olde-Weg 46 24229 Dänischenhagen / DE | |||
04 /
Naderhoff, Uwe Schulz-Kamp 18 29328 Faßberg-Müden / DE | |||
05 /
Schwenzer, Michael Turnerstraße 32 29320 Hermannsburg / DE | |||
06 /
Thape, Manfred Fuhrenkämpe 24 29556 Suderburg / DE | |||
07 /
Rybol, Martin Dörnbergerstraße 53 29223 Celle / DE | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/02] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08017765.2 | 10.10.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | DE20071057184 | 26.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007057184 | [2009/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063215 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2063215 | Date: | 20.02.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063215 | Date: | 07.01.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F42B12/42, F42B12/62, // F42B4/28 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
F42B4/28 (EP,US);
F42B4/26 (US);
F42B12/42 (EP,US);
F42B12/62 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | F42B12/42, F42B12/62, F42B4/28, // F42B4/28 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/41] |
Former [2013/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, LI | ||
Former [2013/38] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, LI | ||
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Munition oder Geschoss zur Gefechtsfeldbeleuchtung | [2009/22] | English: | Ammunition or projectile for illuminating a battlefield | [2009/22] | French: | Munition ou projectile destiné à l'éclairage d'un champ de bataille | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 07.08.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2013 | Examination requested [2013/38] | 20.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.09.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.12.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 01.12.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.12.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2014 | Opposition(s) | 08.10.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.10.2008 | CY | 07.01.2015 | CZ | 07.01.2015 | DK | 07.01.2015 | EE | 07.01.2015 | ES | 07.01.2015 | HR | 07.01.2015 | LT | 07.01.2015 | LV | 07.01.2015 | MC | 07.01.2015 | MT | 07.01.2015 | NL | 07.01.2015 | PL | 07.01.2015 | PT | 07.01.2015 | RO | 07.01.2015 | SI | 07.01.2015 | SK | 07.01.2015 | TR | 07.01.2015 | BG | 07.04.2015 | GR | 08.04.2015 | IS | 07.05.2015 | [2018/34] |
Former [2017/40] | HU | 10.10.2008 | |
CY | 07.01.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.01.2015 | ||
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
MT | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
TR | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/28] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
MC | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SI | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | CZ | 07.01.2015 | |
DK | 07.01.2015 | ||
EE | 07.01.2015 | ||
ES | 07.01.2015 | ||
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
RO | 07.01.2015 | ||
SK | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
LV | 07.01.2015 | ||
NL | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/38] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
IS | 07.05.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
PL | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
GR | 08.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
HR | 07.01.2015 | ||
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
BG | 07.04.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | ES | 07.01.2015 | |
LT | 07.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/33] | ES | 07.01.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US3056351 (MARIE BARES ROGER JEAN) [Y] 8 * column 1, lines 11-12 * * column 5, lines 34-37 * * figure 1b *; | [XY]US3491689 (FRANCOIS MARCEL) [X] 1,4-7 * column 1, lines 30-34 * * column 2, lines 35-56 * * column 3, lines 15-55 * * figures 1,2,3,7,8 * [Y] 2,3,8; | [AD]DE2103672 (AKTIEBOLAGET BOFORS)[AD] 1; | [Y]EP0423424 (RHEINMETALL GMBH [DE]) [Y] 2,3 * abstract * * column 3, line 48 - column 4, line 58 * * column 6, lines 7-12 * * figures 1,7 * | by applicant | DE2103672 | DE7511529U | DE2830224 |