EP2060542 - Process for recovering chemicals from wastewater by using nitrogen compounds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 24.09.2010 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.09.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.10.2010 [2010/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Pöltener Str. 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | For all designated states Voith Patent GmbH St. Poeltener Strasse 43 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schubert, Hans-Ludwig Dr. Kickachstr. 11 88255 Baienfurt / DE | 02 /
Aalto, Esa-Matti Parkstr. 22b 22605 Hamburg / DE | 03 /
Paasch, Volker Rossstr. 11 88212 Ravensburg / DE | [2009/21] | Application number, filing date | 08018032.6 | 15.10.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | DE20071054208 | 12.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007054208 | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060542 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/28 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
D21C11/0014 (EP);
C02F3/2846 (EP);
C02F3/30 (EP);
C02F2101/101 (EP);
C02F2103/28 (EP);
C02F2301/08 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Rückgewinnung von Chemikalien aus Abwasser unter Verwendung von Stickstoff-Verbindungen | [2009/21] | English: | Process for recovering chemicals from wastewater by using nitrogen compounds | [2009/21] | French: | Procédé de récupération des agents chimiques à l'aide de composés azotés dans des eaux résiduelles | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 20.11.2009 | Examination requested [2009/53] | 22.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/43] | 08.06.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/43] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2006243660 (KAMACHI KAZUMASA [JP], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0001] , [0008] , [0009] , [0030] , [0042] , [0043] *; | [Y]US2004011735 (HAHN MELVIN [US]) [Y] 1-4 * paragraphs [0004] , [0005] , [0013] , [0014] , [0032] *; | [Y]US5976375 (DORICA JOSEPH G [CA], et al) [Y] 1-4 * claims 1-12 * * figures 1,2 * * examples 1-5 * * column 1, line 15 - line 18 * | by applicant | WO9951532 | DE102005050997 | DE102006027006 |