04.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] |
24.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.08.2015 [2015/35] |
17.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] |
03.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.08.2015 [2015/32] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
18.07.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] |
20.06.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 23.07.2014 [2014/30] |
16.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.06.2014 [2014/25] |
09.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
02.05.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.06.2014 [2014/23] |
25.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 28.05.2014 [2014/22] |
18.04.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
28.03.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.04.2014 [2014/18] |
28.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.04.2014 [2014/14] |
14.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.03.2014 [2014/12] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
31.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 05.03.2014 [2014/10] |
24.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2014 [2014/09] |
17.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.02.2014 [2014/08] |
10.01.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2014 [2014/07] |
15.11.2013 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.12.2013 [2013/51] |
12.07.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.08.2013 [2013/33] |
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.07.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
04.03.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.01.2013 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.12.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.01.2013 [2013/03] |
28.09.2012 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 31.10.2012 [2012/44] |
21.09.2012 |
First examination report |
|
18.09.2012 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.09.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 04.07.2012 [2012/27] |
16.03.2012 |
Change - representative |
published on 18.04.2012 [2012/16] |
27.01.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 29.02.2012 [2012/09] |
20.01.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
20.01.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
20.01.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 22.02.2012 [2012/08] |
07.11.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.08.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.04.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 27.05.2009 [2009/22] |