Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009110476 | Global Dossier | 30.04.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202007014997 | 27.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2008237567 | Global Dossier | 14.05.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE202007014997 | 27.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2053256 | Global Dossier | 11.07.2012 | B1 | EP2053256 | 24.11.2010 | A3 | EP2053256 | 29.04.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE202007014997 | 27.10.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE202007014997U | 14.02.2008 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE202007014997 | 27.10.2007 |