EP2072776 - Heat transfer arrangement for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.09.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schneider, Klaus Tiefenbronner Strasse 28 75233 Tiefenbronn / DE | [2009/26] | Application number, filing date | 08018277.7 | 18.10.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071062346 | 22.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007062346 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2072776 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2072776 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | F01P3/18, B60K11/04 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
F01P3/18 (EP);
B60K11/04 (EP);
F01P5/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, IT [2012/41] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Wärmeübertragungsanordnung für ein Fahrzeug | [2009/26] | English: | Heat transfer arrangement for a vehicle | [2009/26] | French: | Agencement de transmission de chaleur pour un véhicule | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2012 | Examination requested [2012/37] | 02.08.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 07.09.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 03.05.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/40] | 30.05.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2017/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 31.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 02.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2016 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]GB2326626 (ROVER GROUP [GB]) [X] 1-3,5,6,9,10 * page 3, line 18 - page 5, line 13; figures 1,3 * [Y] 8; | [X]DE3930076 (MERCEDES-BENZ AG) [X] 1,3,10 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 60; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE102005024444 (BEHR GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [Y] 8 * paragraphs [0040] , [0041]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | DE334488 | DE3344220 | DE1022105 | DE10233859 | DE19849619 |