EP2052593 - Method and device for making raised planting beds [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): BG | published on 16.10.2013 [2013/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Strothmann, Eckhard Gütersloher Strasse 37 33790 Halle / DE | [2010/23] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Amazonen-Werke H. Dreyer GmbH & Co. KG Am Amazonenwerk 85 49205 Hasbergen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/23] |
Former [2010/17] | 01 /
Strothmann, Eckhardt Gütersloher Str. 37 33790 Halle-Sandforth / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | 01 /
Strothmann, Eckhardt Gütersloherstr. 37 33790 Halle-Sandforth / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018463.3 | 22.10.2008 | [2009/18] | Priority number, date | DE20072015000U | 27.10.2007 Original published format: DE 202007015000 U | [2009/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2052593 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052593 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Type: | B8 Corrected title page of specification | No.: | EP2052593 | Date: | 01.09.2010 | [2010/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A01B13/02, A01C5/06, A01B49/06 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
A01B13/025 (EP);
A01B49/06 (EP);
A01C5/064 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/18] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Herstellung von Saatdämmen | [2009/18] | English: | Method and device for making raised planting beds | [2009/18] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour la formation de rangs de culture élevés | [2009/18] | Examination procedure | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 14.12.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.03.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 16.03.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.02.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/15] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 05.05.2010 | DK | 05.05.2010 | EE | 05.05.2010 | FI | 05.05.2010 | HR | 05.05.2010 | IE | 05.05.2010 | IT | 05.05.2010 | LT | 05.05.2010 | LV | 05.05.2010 | MT | 05.05.2010 | NL | 05.05.2010 | PL | 05.05.2010 | PT | 05.05.2010 | RO | 05.05.2010 | SE | 05.05.2010 | SI | 05.05.2010 | SK | 05.05.2010 | TR | 05.05.2010 | CY | 09.06.2010 | BG | 05.08.2010 | NO | 05.08.2010 | GR | 06.08.2010 | ES | 16.08.2010 | IS | 05.09.2010 | LU | 22.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | FR | 02.11.2010 | HU | 06.11.2010 | [2013/42] |
Former [2013/32] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PT | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
LU | 22.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/47] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
TR | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
LU | 22.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
LU | 22.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
HU | 06.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BG | 05.05.2010 | |
CZ | 05.05.2010 | ||
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
MT | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | CZ | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/35] | CZ | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
FR | 02.11.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 05.05.2010 | |
DK | 05.05.2010 | ||
EE | 05.05.2010 | ||
FI | 05.05.2010 | ||
HR | 05.05.2010 | ||
IE | 05.05.2010 | ||
IT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LT | 05.05.2010 | ||
LV | 05.05.2010 | ||
NL | 05.05.2010 | ||
PL | 05.05.2010 | ||
RO | 05.05.2010 | ||
SE | 05.05.2010 | ||
SI | 05.05.2010 | ||
SK | 05.05.2010 | ||
CY | 09.06.2010 | ||
NO | 05.08.2010 | ||
GR | 06.08.2010 | ||
ES | 16.08.2010 | ||
IS | 05.09.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 05.05.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2146211 (SCORGIE WILLIAM EDWARD) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 2, line 5 - line 35 ** figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5660126 (FREED BRIAN E [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 7, lines 1-8,45-55 * * column 8, line 56 - line 64 * * column 9, line 56 - line 67 * * column 10, line 1 - line 10 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US6330922 (KING THOMAS P [US]) [A] 1-12 * abstract * * column 3, line 33 - line 67 * * column 5, line 47 - line 53 * * column 6, line 31 - line 47 * * figure -; claim - *; | [A]FR2839608 (EVIN MICHEL [FR]) [A] 1,4 * abstract * * page 8, line 13 - line 35 * * page 9, lines 1-7,21-30 * * figure -; claim - * |