EP2018941 - Glazing panel cut-out tool [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/05] | Cutting device | ||
[2012/19] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.02.2013 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belron Hungary Kft-Zug Branch Gotthardstrasse 20 6304 Zug / CH | [2012/21] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Belron Hungary Kft- Zug branch Gotthardstrasse 20 6304 Zug / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Davies, Christopher Ty Coch Farm Pembrey Road Carmarthenshire SA17 4TF / GB | 02 /
Mival, Nicholas James Top Floor 12 Stanhope Place London W2 2HH / GB | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Davies, Gregory Mark Murgitroyd & Company Cardiff Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/05] | Davies, Gregory Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord LLP Churchill House Churchill Way Cardiff CF10 2HH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08018671.1 | 25.07.2003 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | GB20020017215 | 25.07.2002 Original published format: GB 0217215 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2018941 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2018941 | Date: | 04.02.2009 | [2009/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B26B27/00 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
B26D7/088 (EP,GB,US);
B23D49/105 (GB);
B23D49/11 (GB);
B23D49/167 (EP,GB,US);
B23D51/01 (GB);
B23D51/10 (GB);
B26B29/06 (GB);
B26B7/00 (EP,US);
B26B9/02 (GB);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | Ausschneidwerkzeug für Glasscheiben | [2012/19] | English: | Glazing panel cut-out tool | [2012/19] | French: | Outil pour le découpage d'un panneau de vitrage | [2012/19] |
Former [2009/05] | Schneidegerät | ||
Former [2009/05] | Cutting device | ||
Former [2009/05] | Dispositif de découpe | Examination procedure | 21.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/36] | 21.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.09.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/11] | 22.10.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03771177.7 / EP1534475 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030771177) is 27.05.2005 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 16.11.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 16.11.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.11.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 18.06.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 18.06.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.06.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.05.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 09.05.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2012 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3052977 (WISE GLENN E); | [X]US3085330 (JULIUS LEWINSKI, et al); | [X]US3412767 (GREEN JR JAMES); | [X]US4199852 (AYERS LEWIS W [US], et al); | [X]US4802280 (LAPIANA JOHN [US]); | [X]DE4019933 (BAYERISCHE MOTOREN WERKE AG [DE]) |