Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8371031 | Global Dossier | 12.02.2013 | B2 | US2011203429 | 25.08.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201113100820 | 04.05.2011 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | US17593105 | 06.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008201963 | Global Dossier | 28.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2007006468 | Global Dossier | 11.01.2007 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US17593105 | 06.07.2005 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP4708788B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2011 | B2 | JP2005533592 | 10.11.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2027978 | Global Dossier | 25.02.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03771177 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2017043 | Global Dossier | 21.01.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP03771177 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1534475 | Global Dossier | 05.11.2008 | B1 | EP1534475 | 01.06.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009217372 | Global Dossier | 08.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2003254491 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | AU2009217372 | 18.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009217371B | Global Dossier | 01.03.2012 | B2 | AU2009217371 | 15.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2003254491 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | AU2009217371 | 18.09.2009 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2009217369 | Global Dossier | 15.10.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2003254491 | 25.07.2003 | AU2009217369 | 18.09.2009 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2003254491C | Global Dossier | 01.04.2010 | C1 | AU2003254491B | 29.10.2009 | B2 | AU2003254491 | 16.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2018941 | Global Dossier | 04.02.2009 | A3 | EP2018941 | 28.01.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP03771177 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR0312880 | 10.09.2013 | B1 | BR0312880 | 28.06.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2493665 | 27.11.2012 | C | CA2493665 | 05.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2736606 | 05.02.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2493665 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE60324569D1 | 18.12.2008 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK1534475T | 09.02.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20050056 | 31.08.2005 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ME00392 | 10.10.2011 | B | MEP52708 | 10.05.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NO334538B | 31.03.2014 | B1 | NO20050722L | 10.02.2005 | L | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ537652 | 23.02.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ547816 | 28.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ53765203 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ547817 | 28.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ53765203 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ547818 | 28.03.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | NZ53765203 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS51409 | 28.02.2011 | B | RS20050043 | 04.04.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI1534475T | 30.04.2009 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP03771177 | 25.07.2003 | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | GB0303251 | 25.07.2003 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2004011204 | Global Dossier | 08.04.2004 | A3 | WO2004011204 | 05.02.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010246944 | Global Dossier | 04.11.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010234065 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2010234064 | Global Dossier | 21.10.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE413259T | 15.11.2008 | T1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100379532C | 09.04.2008 | C | CN1671520 | 21.09.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN100592970C | 03.03.2010 | C | CN101036989 | 19.09.2007 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101108486 | 23.01.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101244568 | 20.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2316833T | 16.04.2009 | T3 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2391194 | 05.07.2006 | B | GB2391194 | 04.02.2004 | A | GB0217215D0 | 04.09.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2415402 | 05.07.2006 | B | GB2415402 | 28.12.2005 | A | GB0519114D0 | 26.10.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2415403 | 05.07.2006 | B | GB2415403 | 28.12.2005 | A | GB0519116D0 | 26.10.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2415404 | 29.11.2006 | B | GB2415404 | 28.12.2005 | A | GB0519118D0 | 26.10.2005 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1058774 | 04.06.2004 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1086524 | 22.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1086525 | 22.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1086526 | 22.09.2006 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL211056B | 30.04.2012 | B1 | PL373472 | 05.09.2005 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT1534475E | 02.01.2009 | E | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS20100092 | 31.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS20100093 | 31.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS20100094 | 31.12.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | GB0217215 | 25.07.2002 | Type | Earlier application | EP1534475 |