EP2072026 - Modular middle ear total prosthetic [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.01.2011 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Heinz Kurz GmbH Medizintechnik Tübinger Strasse 3 72144 Dusslingen / DE | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Steinhardt, Uwe Starzelstrasse 28 72145 Hirrlingen / DE | 02 /
Schmid, Georg, Dr. Mathildenstrasse 47 72072 Tübingen / DE | 03 /
Kurz, Heinz Tübinger Strasse 3 72144 Dusslingen / DE | 04 /
Heckmann, Walter Kapuzinergarten 3 72108 Rottenburg / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Kaiserstrasse 85 72764 Reutlingen / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018714.9 | 25.10.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071062151 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007062151 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072026 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2072026 | Date: | 24.03.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/12] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/18 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
A61F2/18 (EP,US);
A61F2002/183 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Modulare Mittelohr-Totalprothese | [2009/26] | English: | Modular middle ear total prosthetic | [2009/26] | French: | Prothèse totale de l'oreille moyenne modulaire | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 15.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/27] | 20.10.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/09] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 24.03.2010 | DK | 24.03.2010 | EE | 24.03.2010 | FI | 24.03.2010 | HR | 24.03.2010 | IE | 24.03.2010 | LT | 24.03.2010 | LV | 24.03.2010 | MT | 24.03.2010 | PL | 24.03.2010 | PT | 24.03.2010 | RO | 24.03.2010 | SE | 24.03.2010 | SI | 24.03.2010 | SK | 24.03.2010 | TR | 24.03.2010 | BG | 24.06.2010 | NO | 24.06.2010 | GR | 25.06.2010 | IS | 24.07.2010 | HU | 25.09.2010 | LU | 25.10.2010 | BE | 31.10.2010 | MC | 31.10.2010 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
HR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
TR | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
NO | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
LU | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/44] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
HR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
NO | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
LU | 25.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
HR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
NO | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
HU | 25.09.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 24.03.2010 | |
DK | 24.03.2010 | ||
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
HR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
NO | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | DK | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
HR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
MT | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
NO | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/40] | DK | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
HR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
NO | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
BE | 31.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | DK | 24.03.2010 | |
EE | 24.03.2010 | ||
FI | 24.03.2010 | ||
HR | 24.03.2010 | ||
IE | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
RO | 24.03.2010 | ||
SE | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
SK | 24.03.2010 | ||
BG | 24.06.2010 | ||
NO | 24.06.2010 | ||
GR | 25.06.2010 | ||
IS | 24.07.2010 | ||
MC | 31.10.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | FI | 24.03.2010 | |
HR | 24.03.2010 | ||
LT | 24.03.2010 | ||
LV | 24.03.2010 | ||
PL | 24.03.2010 | ||
SI | 24.03.2010 | ||
NO | 24.06.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]DE29904770U (SPIGGLE & THEIS [DE]) [X] 1 * page 7 - page 10; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2-15; | [Y]WO9942060 (SPIGGLE & THEIS [DE], et al) [Y] 1-15* the whole document *; | [Y]DE20014659U (HEINZ KURZ GMBH MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * claim - *; | [X]US6168625 (PRESCOTT ANTHONY D [US]) [X] 1 * the whole document *; | [XY]DE202007012217U (HEINZ KURZ GMBH MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0072]; figure -; claim - * [Y] 2-15 | by applicant | DE29904770U | WO02069850 | US6554861 | DE20310609U | EP1181907 | DE202004012148U | DE202007012217U |