EP2181710 - Ligands for modulation of orphan receptor-gamma (NR1F3) activity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.05.2011 [2011/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Phenex Pharmaceuticals AG J542N, Werksgelände BASF 67056 Ludwigshafen / DE | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kremoser, Claus Gugenmusweg 20 69121 Heidelberg / DE | 02 /
Abel, Ulrich Spitzwegstrasse 4 69126 Heidelberg / DE | 03 /
Deutschle, Ulrich Neustädterstrasse 18 67549 Worms / DE | 04 /
Schlueter, Thomas Wieblinger Weg 33/5 69123 Heidelberg / DE | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018795.8 | 28.10.2008 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181710 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/575, A61P17/06, A61P37/06, A61P1/00, A61P17/00, A61P29/00, G01N33/50 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
A61K31/575 (EP,US);
A61K31/192 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP,US);
A61P1/00 (EP);
A61P17/00 (EP);
A61P17/06 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (EP);
G01N33/542 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2011/02] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Liganden zur Modulation der Orphan-Rezeptor-Gamma (NR1F3) Aktivität | [2010/18] | English: | Ligands for modulation of orphan receptor-gamma (NR1F3) activity | [2010/18] | French: | Ligands pour la modulation de l'activité du récepteur gamma orphelin (NR1F3) | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 06.11.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/21] | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/21] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2010 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2008115469 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * page 3, paragraph 4 * * claim 7 * * page 14, paragraph 1 *; | [X] - HELIOVAARA M ET AL, "Serum cholesterol and risk of rheumatoid arthritis in a cohort of 52800 men and women", BRITISH JOURNAL OF RHEUMATOLOGY, BAILLIERE TINDALL, LONDON, GB, (19960101), vol. 35, no. 3, ISSN 0263-7103, pages 255 - 257, XP008101938 [X] 1-4,6,8,10 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/rheumatology/35.3.255 | by applicant | WO0024757 | WO9927365 | - BECKER-ANDREE, BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS. RES. COMMUN., (1993), vol. 194, pages 1371 - 1379 | - ANDRE ET AL., GENE, (1998), vol. 516, pages 277 - 283 | - HE ET AL., IMMUNITY, (1998), vol. 9, pages 797 - 806 | - MANGELSDORF ET AL., CELL, (1995), vol. 83, pages 835 - 839 | - MCKENNA ET AL., ENDOCRINE REV., (1999), vol. 20, pages 321 - 344 | - VANACKER ET AL., MOL. ENDOCRINOL., (1999), vol. 13, pages 864 - 773 | - WILLY ET AL., PNAS, (2004), vol. 101, pages 8912 - 8917 | - ANDRE ET AL., GENE, (1998), vol. 216, pages 277 - 283 | - VILLEY ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (1999), vol. 29, pages 4072 - 7080 | - EBERL ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 305, pages 248 - 251 | - EVANS ET AL., SCIENCE, (1988), vol. 240, pages 889 - 895 | - GIGUERE ET AL., GENOMICS, (1995), vol. 28, pages 596 - 598 | - VANACKER ET AL., MOL. ENDOCRINOL., (1999), vol. 13, pages 764 - 773 | - WILSON ET AL., MOL. CELL BIOL., (1993), vol. 13, pages 5794 - 5708 | - FORMAN ET AL., "Cross-talk among ROR alpha 1 and the Rev-erb family of orphan nuclear receptors", MOL. ENDOCRINOL., (1994), vol. 8, pages 1253 - 1261 | - AKASHI; TAKUMI, NAT. STRUCT. MOL. BIOL., (2005), vol. 12, pages 441 - 448 | - HAMILTON ET AL., NATURE, (1996), vol. 379, pages 736 - 739 | - J. BIOL. CHEM., (2008), vol. 283, pages 18411 - 18421 | - ANDRE ET AL., EMBO. J., (1998), vol. 17, pages 3867 - 3877 | - EBERL; LITTMANN, IMMUNOL. REV., (2003), vol. 195, pages 81 - 90 | - SUN ET AL., SCIENCE, (2000), vol. 288, pages 2369 - 2373 | - HE ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2000), vol. 164, pages 5668 - 5674 | - TILLEY ET AL., J. IMMUNOL., (2007), vol. 178, pages 3208 - 3218 | - TESMER ET AL., IMMUNOL. REV., (2008), vol. 223, pages 87 - 113 | - YANG ET AL., IMMUNITY, (2008), vol. 28, pages 29 - 39 | - GU ET AL., EUR. J. IMMUNOL., (2008), vol. 38, pages 1807 - 1813 | - KANG ET AL., PHYSIOL. GENOMICS, (2007), vol. 31, pages 281 - 294 | - KALLEN ET AL., STRUCTURE, (2002), vol. 10, pages 1697 - 1707 | - MISSBACH ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (1998), vol. 271, pages 13515 - 13522 | - WIESENBERG ET AL., NUCLEIC ACID RES., (1995), vol. 23, pages 327 - 333 | - STEHLIN-GAON ET AL., NAT. STRUCT. BIOL., (2003), vol. 10, pages 820 - 825 | - MEDVEDEV ET AL., GENE, (1996), vol. 181, pages 199 - 206 | - TESMER, IMMUNOL. REV., (2008), vol. 223, pages 97 - 113 | - MATHIS ET AL., CLIN. CHEM., (1993), vol. 39, pages 1953 - 1959 |