EP2078552 - Vapour-liquid distribution device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Haldor Topso̸e A/S Nymo̸llevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | [2014/25] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states Haldor Topsoe A/S Nymollevej 55 2800 Kgs. Lyngby / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Risbjerg Jarlkov, Klaus Kjortovej 4 4652 Harlev / DK | [2009/29] | Application number, filing date | 08018929.3 | 30.10.2008 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | DK20080000029 | 09.01.2008 Original published format: DK 200800029 | [2009/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078552 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2078552 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B01D3/00, B01D3/26, B01D3/32, B01J8/02, B01J8/04 | [2014/09] | CPC: |
B01J8/0278 (EP,US);
B01J10/00 (KR);
B01D3/008 (EP,US);
B01D3/26 (EP,US);
B01D3/324 (EP,US);
B01J4/00 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2009/29] | B01D3/00, B01D3/32, B01J8/02, B01J8/04 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | Dampfflüssigkeitsverteilungsvorrichtung | [2009/29] | English: | Vapour-liquid distribution device | [2009/29] | French: | Dispositif de distribution vapeur-liquide | [2014/09] |
Former [2009/29] | Dispositif de distribution de vapeur liquide | Examination procedure | 15.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 01.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 01.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 19.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2008 | AT | 18.06.2014 | BG | 18.06.2014 | CY | 18.06.2014 | CZ | 18.06.2014 | DK | 18.06.2014 | EE | 18.06.2014 | HR | 18.06.2014 | LT | 18.06.2014 | LV | 18.06.2014 | MC | 18.06.2014 | MT | 18.06.2014 | RO | 18.06.2014 | SE | 18.06.2014 | SI | 18.06.2014 | SK | 18.06.2014 | TR | 18.06.2014 | NO | 18.09.2014 | GR | 19.09.2014 | IS | 18.10.2014 | IE | 30.10.2014 | LU | 30.10.2014 | CH | 31.10.2014 | LI | 31.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 30.10.2008 | |
AT | 18.06.2014 | ||
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
TR | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
IE | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
BG | 18.06.2014 | ||
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
IE | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/46] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
IE | 30.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SI | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/33] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
CH | 31.10.2014 | ||
LI | 31.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/27] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
MC | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
LU | 30.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
DK | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 18.06.2014 | |
CY | 18.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
IS | 18.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
RO | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
CZ | 18.06.2014 | ||
EE | 18.06.2014 | ||
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
SK | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
HR | 18.06.2014 | ||
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
LV | 18.06.2014 | ||
SE | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
GR | 19.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
NO | 18.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 18.06.2014 | |
LT | 18.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 18.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US1605264 (MILLARD RAYMOND B) [X] 1-8 * page 1, lines 1-20 * * page 2, lines 79-116 * * page 4, lines 6-32 * * figure 2 *; | [X]US2578670 (CARLETON ROBERT A) [X] 1-8 * column 4, line 69 - column 5, line 39 * * column 8, lines 18-49 * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]US3392967 (ECKERT JOHN S) [A] 1-8 * column 1, line 45 - column 2, line 18 * * figures 1-5 *; | [DA]US4126540 (GROSBOLL MARTIN P, et al) [DA] 1-8* the whole document *; | [X]US4764347 (MILLIGAN JOHN D [US]) [X] 1-8 * column 3, lines 34-67 * * figures 2-4 *; | [DA]US5158714 (SHIH CHIEN-CHENG J [US], et al) [DA] 1-8 * the whole document *; | [A]US5224351 (JEANNOT PIERRE [FR], et al) [A] 1-8 * column 5, line 11 - column 6, line 22 * * column 13, line 40 - column 14, line 27 * * figures 32-34 * | by applicant | US3353924 | US4126540 | US4836989 | US5158714 | US5192465 | US5942162 |