EP2083198 - Method and control unit for controlling a power train that has a double clutch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.2012 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dr. Ing. h.c. F. Porsche AG Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | [2010/13] |
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Dr.Ing. H.C. F. Porsche Aktiengesellschaft Porscheplatz 1 70435 Stuttgart / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoffmeister, Jan-Peter Balinger Strasse 27 71229 Leonberg / DE | 02 /
Baur, Peter Dammstrasse 2/3 71297 Moensheim / DE | [2009/31] | Application number, filing date | 08018976.4 | 30.10.2008 | [2009/31] | Priority number, date | DE20081006194 | 26.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008006194 | [2009/31] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2083198 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2083198 | Date: | 20.07.2011 | [2011/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/04, F16D48/06, B60W30/20, B60W30/18, B60W10/10, // F16H61/688 | [2011/29] | CPC: |
F16H61/0437 (EP,US);
B60W10/113 (EP,US);
B60W30/18063 (EP,US);
B60W30/181 (EP,US);
B60W30/20 (EP,US);
F16H61/688 (EP,US);
B60W2710/065 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1086 (EP,US);
F16D2500/3067 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70436 (EP,US);
F16D2500/70454 (EP,US);
F16H2302/00 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/31] | F16H61/04, // F16H61/688 | Designated contracting states | DE, GB, IT [2012/13] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Steuergerät zur Steuerung eines Triebstrangs, der ein Doppelkupplungsgetriebe aufweist | [2009/31] | English: | Method and control unit for controlling a power train that has a double clutch | [2009/31] | French: | Procédé et appareil de commande destinés à la commande d'un faisceau d'entraînement, comprenant une boîte de vitesse double | [2009/31] | Examination procedure | 20.01.2012 | Examination requested [2012/09] | 21.01.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/29] | 21.01.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2012/29] | 27.02.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1450074 (BORGWARNER INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7-10 * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] * * claim 1 *; | [XI]WO2007124710 (LUK LAMELLEN & KUPPLUNGSBAU [DE], et al) [X] 1,7,9,10 * page 5, line 19 - page 6, line 21 * * page 8, lines 11-16 * [I] 2-4,8; | [XI]EP1507103 (GETRAG FORD TRANSMISSIONS GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,10 * paragraphs [0021] , [0022] * [I] 2-4; | [XI]DE19939334 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,10 * column 7, lines 8-58 * [I] 2-4; | [XI]WO2004033246 (LUK LAMELLEN UND KUPPLLUNGSBAU [DE], et al) [X] 1,3,7,9,10 * page 4, line 29 - page 5, line 19 * [I] 2,4; | [XI]DE102005006556 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [X] 1,7,9,10 * paragraph [0032] * [I] 2-4 |