EP2181843 - Multilayered film and in-mold label obtained from said film [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.04.2011 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.04.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.05.2011 [2011/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Taghleef Industries SPA Via Enrico Fermi, 46 33058 San Giorgio Di Nogaro (UD) / IT | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Piasente, Francesca Via Aquileia, 81 33050 Gonars, Udine / IT | [2010/18] | Representative(s) | Metten, Karl-Heinz Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/18] | Metten, Karl-Heinz Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08018978.0 | 30.10.2008 | [2010/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181843 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/00, G09F3/04 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B32B27/32 (EP);
B32B27/16 (EP);
B32B27/20 (EP);
B32B2250/242 (EP);
B32B2264/025 (EP);
B32B2264/10 (EP);
B32B2264/102 (EP);
B32B2307/21 (EP);
B32B2307/516 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | [2011/02] |
Former [2010/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mehrschichtige Folie und aus dieser Folie erzeugtes eingeformtes Etikett | [2010/18] | English: | Multilayered film and in-mold label obtained from said film | [2010/18] | French: | Film multicouche et étiquette dans le moule obtenue à partir dudit film | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 07.12.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2011/18] | 14.12.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2011/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2000056690 ; | [X]WO9620084 (COURTAULDS FILMS HOLDINGS [GB], et al); | [A]EP0949599 (OJI YUKA SYNT PAPER CO LTD [JP], et al); | [X]EP1122704 (YUPO CORP [JP]); | [A]WO2007022463 (ADVANCED PLASTICS TECHNOLOGIES [LU], et al); | [A]EP1768079 (YUPO CORP [JP]); | [X]GB2444761 (AMCOR FLEXIBLES WINTERBOURNE L [GB]); | by applicant | EP0538746 | EP0344230 | EP0563796 | EP0862991 | EP0611102 | EP0367613 | EP0545650 | DE19949898 | EP0619183 |