EP2055523 - Method for charging a powertrain [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.02.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations LLC 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | For all designated states Daimler AG 70546 Stuttgart / DE | For all designated states Chrysler LLC 800 Chrysler Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2757 / US | For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80809 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/04] | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations LLC 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | ||
For all designated states Daimler AG 70546 Stuttgart / DE | |||
For all designated states Chrysler LLC 800 Chrysler Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326-2757 / US | |||
For all designated states Bayerische Motoren Werke Aktiengesellschaft Petuelring 130 80788 München / DE | |||
Former [2011/30] | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations LLC 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | ||
Former [2009/19] | For all designated states GM Global Technology Operations, Inc. 300 Renaissance Center Detroit, MI 48265-3000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kokotovich, Nicholas 855 West Wattles Troy Michigan 48098 / US | 02 /
Kothari, Aniket 28132 Brentwood Street Southfield Michigan 48076 / US | 03 /
Bolton, Michael 9701 Pennfield Rd. Battle Creek Michigan 49014-8107 / US | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Manitz Finsterwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltspartnerschaft mbB Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/14] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/19] | Manitz, Finsterwald & Partner GbR Postfach 31 02 20 80102 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019057.2 | 30.10.2008 | [2009/19] | Priority number, date | US20070985270P | 04.11.2007 Original published format: US 985270 P | US20080253225 | 16.10.2008 Original published format: US 253225 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2055523 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2055523 | Date: | 07.03.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2055523 | Date: | 03.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.2012 | Classification | IPC: | B60L11/18, // B60W20/00 | [2009/19] | CPC: |
B60L53/00 (EP,US);
B60K6/365 (EP,US);
B60K6/445 (EP,US);
B60K6/48 (EP,US);
B60K6/547 (EP,US);
B60L50/16 (EP,US);
B60L50/61 (EP,US);
B60L58/24 (EP,US);
B60W10/08 (EP,US);
B60W10/24 (US);
B60W10/26 (EP,US);
B60W20/10 (US);
B60W50/04 (US);
B60L2240/423 (EP,US);
B60L2240/445 (EP,US);
B60L2240/486 (EP,US);
B60L2240/662 (EP,US);
B60L2240/80 (EP,US);
B60W20/00 (EP);
B60W2050/0006 (EP);
B60W2510/0676 (EP,US);
B60W2510/1015 (EP,US);
B60W2510/104 (EP,US);
B60W2510/244 (EP,US);
B60W2510/246 (EP,US);
B60W2540/10 (EP,US);
B60W2540/12 (EP,US);
B60W2555/20 (EP,US);
B60W2710/083 (EP,US);
Y02T10/62 (EP,US);
Y02T10/64 (EP,US);
Y02T10/70 (EP,US);
Y02T10/7072 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2012/46] |
Former [2009/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Laden eines Antriebsstrangs | [2009/19] | English: | Method for charging a powertrain | [2009/19] | French: | Procédé de chargement d'une transmission | [2009/19] | Examination procedure | 06.09.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.09.2012 | Examination requested [2012/43] | 08.09.2012 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.10.2012 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 24.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 15.02.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 24.10.2012 | Opposition(s) | 06.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5686812 (HOTTA YOSHIHIKO [JP]) [Y] 6 * column 2, lines 44-62 * * column 1, lines 66-67 *; | [XY]US5717310 (SAKAI KOUJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-3,5 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 12; figures 3,4 * * column 5, line 66 - column 6, line 6 * [Y] 4,6,7; | [A]US5952813 (OCHIAI SHINOBU [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2003132730 (OCHIAI SHINOBU [JP]) [Y] 7 * column 6, lines 11-38 *; | [Y]US2004164703 (BERELS DAVID JEFFEORY [US]) [Y] 4 * column 1, lines 53-61 *; | [A]US2005068003 (GAUTHIER GREG E [US], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006112510 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document * | by applicant | US20070985270 |