EP2060476 - Drive modification for an armoured howitzer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 21.12.2012 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.2012 | Refusal of application | published on 23.01.2013 [2013/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH Dr.-Hell-Strasse 24107 Kiel / DE | [2009/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kühl, Manfred Kieler Strasse 11 24229 Schwedeneck / DE | [2009/21] | Representative(s) | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Derendorfer Allee 6 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/21] | Dietrich, Barbara Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1 40476 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019153.9 | 31.10.2008 | [2009/21] | Priority number, date | DE20072015270U | 01.11.2007 Original published format: DE 202007015270 U | [2009/21] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2060476 | Date: | 20.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62D55/10, B62D55/104 | [2009/21] | CPC: |
B62D55/104 (EP);
B62D55/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/21] | Title | German: | Laufwerksmodifikation für eine Panzerhaubitze | [2009/21] | English: | Drive modification for an armoured howitzer | [2009/21] | French: | Modification de train de roulement pour obusier blindé | [2009/21] | Examination procedure | 21.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/49] | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2012 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.07.2012 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 03.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2013/04] | 13.09.2012 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2013/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]DE1909245U (FRIESEKE & HOEPFNER GMBH [DE]) [Y] 1-6 * page 1, lines 20-27 * * page 2, lines 8,9; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US4262764 (KRAUS PETER B) [Y] 1-6* column 2, line 52 - column 3, line 12; figures 1,3-5 * | Examination | - CURTISS-WRIGHT DRIVE TECHNOLOGY, "HYDROP-Travelling at its best", (20070130), USA, URL: http://www.armedforces-int.com/article/hydrop-travelling-comfort-at-its-best.html | by applicant | CH518212 | DE3245880 | DE4412552 | DE10326970 | DE10328541 | DE202006013043U |