EP2072952 - Method of creating an electronically storable digital map [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.10.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Navigon AG Schottmüllerstrasse 20 A 20251 Hamburg / DE | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tudose, Radu Annastrasse 11 97072 Würzburg / DE | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | von den Steinen, Axel Advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrasse 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | von den Steinen, Axel advotec. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Beethovenstrases 5 97080 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019208.1 | 03.11.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071062991 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007062991 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2072952 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2072952 | Date: | 30.11.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/30, G01C21/32 | [2011/48] | CPC: |
G01C21/387 (EP,US);
G06F16/289 (EP,US);
G06F16/29 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/26] | G01C21/32 | Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2012/32] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Erzeugung einer elektronisch speicherbaren, digitalen Landkarte | [2009/27] | English: | Method of creating an electronically storable digital map | [2009/26] | French: | Procédé destiné à la production d'une carte géographique numérique et mémorisable électroniquement | [2009/26] |
Former [2009/26] | Verfahren zur erzeugung einer elektronisch speicherbaren, digitalen landkarte | Examination procedure | 31.05.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/47] | 06.07.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2012/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YA]US6073076 (CROWLEY PAUL [US], et al) [Y] 12-14 * the whole document * [A] 1-11; | [IY] - PUCHERAL P ET AL, "EFFICIENT MAIN MEMORY DATA MANAGEMENT USING THE DBGRAPH STORAGE MODEL", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON VERY LARGEDATA BASES, XX, XX, (19900813), pages 683 - 695, XP002192007 [I] 1-11 * sections 1 and 2; page 683 - page 685; figure 1 * [Y] 12-14 | [IY] - Rajkumar Sen, "An open source DBMS for handheld devices", Mumbai, (20060827), pages 1 - 50, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20060827213107/http://www.cse.iitb.ac.in/dbms/Projects/DELite/report.ps, (20111020), XP055010068 [I] 1-11 * page 6 - page 7; figure 3.1 * [Y] 12-14 |