EP2058911 - Medical supply unit for supplying electricity and transferring data in medical devices [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2010 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TRUMPF Medizin Systeme GmbH + Co. KG Benzstrasse 26 82178 Puchheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | For all designated states TRUMPF Medizin Systeme GmbH + Co. KG Benzstrasse 26 82178 Pucheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bauer, Georg Rauschenerstrasse 2a 85221 Dachau / DE | 02 /
Brunner, Jürgen Falkenweg 2a 82335 Berg / DE | 03 /
Holz, Eberhard Beim Herbstenhof 27 72076 Tübingen / DE | 04 /
Weisheit, Thomas Auwasserweg 22 80995 München / DE | [2009/20] | Representative(s) | Prüfer & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/20] | Prüfer & Partner GbR European Patent Attorneys Sohnckestrasse 12 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019242.0 | 03.11.2008 | [2009/20] | Priority number, date | DE20071053327 | 08.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007053327 | [2009/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2058911 | Date: | 13.05.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2058911 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H02G3/04 | [2009/20] | CPC: |
H02G3/0493 (EP,US);
A61G12/004 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/20] | Title | German: | Medizinische Versorgungseinheit zur Stromversorgung und Datenübertragung bei medizinischen Apparaten | [2009/20] | English: | Medical supply unit for supplying electricity and transferring data in medical devices | [2009/20] | French: | Unité d'alimentation médicale destinée à l'alimentation en courant et la transmission de données pour des appareils médicaux | [2009/20] | Examination procedure | 10.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/20] | 12.06.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/45] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 02.12.2009 | CZ | 02.12.2009 | DK | 02.12.2009 | EE | 02.12.2009 | FI | 02.12.2009 | HR | 02.12.2009 | IE | 02.12.2009 | LT | 02.12.2009 | LV | 02.12.2009 | MT | 02.12.2009 | NL | 02.12.2009 | PL | 02.12.2009 | PT | 02.12.2009 | RO | 02.12.2009 | SE | 02.12.2009 | SI | 02.12.2009 | SK | 02.12.2009 | TR | 02.12.2009 | BG | 02.03.2010 | NO | 02.03.2010 | GR | 03.03.2010 | ES | 13.03.2010 | IS | 02.04.2010 | HU | 03.06.2010 | [2013/32] |
Former [2012/47] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
HR | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
MT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
TR | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
NO | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
HR | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
MT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
NO | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
HU | 03.06.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
HR | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
MT | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
NO | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
DK | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
HR | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
NO | 02.03.2010 | ||
GR | 03.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
CZ | 02.12.2009 | ||
EE | 02.12.2009 | ||
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
HR | 02.12.2009 | ||
IE | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
NL | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
RO | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
SK | 02.12.2009 | ||
BG | 02.03.2010 | ||
NO | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
IS | 02.04.2010 | ||
Former [2010/33] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
HR | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
NO | 02.03.2010 | ||
ES | 13.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 02.12.2009 | |
FI | 02.12.2009 | ||
HR | 02.12.2009 | ||
LT | 02.12.2009 | ||
LV | 02.12.2009 | ||
PL | 02.12.2009 | ||
SE | 02.12.2009 | ||
SI | 02.12.2009 | ||
NO | 02.03.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [DA]DE4239625 (FRESENIUS AG, 6380 BAD HOMBURG, DE) [DA] 1* figure - *; | [A]DE29505072U (TRILUX LENZE GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [A] 1,3,14,15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO9950587 (HILL ROM CO INC [US]) [A] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | DE4239625 |