EP2181792 - Device and method for producing drill holes in an edge of a turbine blade [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2012 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2010/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Berger, Ingo Lindenring 24 15739 Zeuthen / DE | 02 /
Dunkel, Uwe Spandauer Strasse 12 13591 Berlin / DE | 03 /
Raue, Steffi Bouchestrasse 16 12435 Berlin / DE | [2010/18] | Application number, filing date | 08019280.0 | 04.11.2008 | [2010/18] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2181792 | Date: | 05.05.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2181792 | Date: | 20.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B23H9/16, B23B47/28 | [2010/18] | CPC: |
B23B47/28 (EP,US);
B23H11/003 (EP,US);
B23H7/265 (EP,US);
B23H9/10 (EP,US);
B23H9/14 (EP,US);
B23B2215/81 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Herstellen von Bohrungen in einer Kante einer Turbinenschaufel | [2010/18] | English: | Device and method for producing drill holes in an edge of a turbine blade | [2010/18] | French: | Dispositif et procédé destinés à la fabrication de forages dans l'angle d'une aube de turbine | [2010/18] | Examination procedure | 10.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/24] | 01.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 20.04.2011 | CZ | 20.04.2011 | DK | 20.04.2011 | EE | 20.04.2011 | FI | 20.04.2011 | HR | 20.04.2011 | HU | 20.04.2011 | IE | 20.04.2011 | LT | 20.04.2011 | LV | 20.04.2011 | MT | 20.04.2011 | NL | 20.04.2011 | PL | 20.04.2011 | RO | 20.04.2011 | SE | 20.04.2011 | SI | 20.04.2011 | SK | 20.04.2011 | TR | 20.04.2011 | BG | 20.07.2011 | NO | 20.07.2011 | GR | 21.07.2011 | ES | 31.07.2011 | IS | 20.08.2011 | PT | 22.08.2011 | LU | 04.11.2011 | BE | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
TR | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 04.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/29] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
BG | 20.07.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 04.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
LU | 04.11.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
MT | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
BE | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/29] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
CZ | 20.04.2011 | ||
DK | 20.04.2011 | ||
EE | 20.04.2011 | ||
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
IE | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
PL | 20.04.2011 | ||
RO | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
SK | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/02] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
NL | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
LV | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
SI | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
IS | 20.08.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
PL | 26.09.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 20.04.2011 | |
FI | 20.04.2011 | ||
HR | 20.04.2011 | ||
LT | 20.04.2011 | ||
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
GR | 21.07.2011 | ||
ES | 31.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
SE | 20.04.2011 | ||
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 20.04.2011 | |
NO | 20.07.2011 | ||
PT | 22.08.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2538652 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-10 * figures 1,2 *; | [YA]GB2143849 (MTU MUENCHEN GMBH [DE]) [Y] 3-5 * figure 1; claims 1-3 * [A] 2; | [A]US5775856 (WOODARD A BRUCE [US]) [A] 1,10* figure 10 *; | [XY]EP1964632 (GEN ELECTRIC [US]) [X] 1,3,4,7-10 [Y] 3-5 | by applicant | DE2538653 |