EP2067708 - Pallet [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.04.2010 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.06.2010 [2010/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alven, Dan 7 Avenue St. Roman La Tour 98000 Monaco / FR | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/24] | Representative(s) | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/24] | Wallengren, Yngvar Patentbyran Y Wallengren AB Box 116 331 21 Värnamo / SE | Application number, filing date | 08019341.0 | 05.11.2008 | [2009/24] | Priority number, date | SE20070002734 | 07.12.2007 Original published format: SE 0702734 | [2009/24] | Filing language | SV | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2067708 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B65D19/00 | [2009/24] | CPC: |
B65D19/0016 (EP,SE);
B65D2519/00034 (EP,SE);
B65D2519/00069 (EP,SE);
B65D2519/00268 (EP,SE);
B65D2519/00288 (EP);
B65D2519/00303 (EP);
B65D2519/00318 (EP);
B65D2519/00333 (EP);
B65D2519/00407 (SE);
B65D2519/0094 (EP,SE)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/07] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Palette | [2009/24] | English: | Pallet | [2009/24] | French: | Palette | [2009/24] | Examination procedure | 11.12.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/22] | 19.01.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/22] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL7017308 ; | [A]DE29902790U (VOELKER HARALD [DE]); | [X]WO2007069034 (INTER IKEA SYS BV [NL], et al) | by applicant | EP0725010 | DE202004008778U | EP1544117 |