EP2184869 - Method and device for processing audio signals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.04.2018 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.05.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.05.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 01.07.2020 [2020/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Studer Professional Audio GmbH Riedthofstrasse 214 8105 Regensdorf / CH | [2014/27] |
Former [2010/19] | For all designated states Studer Professional Audio GmbH Althardstrasse 30 8105 Regensdorf / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Karamustafaoglu, Attila Häderlihof 10 8057 Zürich / CH | 02 /
Sterngren, Marten Gassackerstrasse 5 8953 Dietikon / CH | [2010/19] | Representative(s) | Bertsch, Florian Oliver, et al Kraus & Weisert Patentanwälte PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [2017/24] |
Former [2010/19] | Bertsch, Florian Oliver, et al Kraus & Weisert Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019429.3 | 06.11.2008 | [2010/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2184869 | Date: | 12.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2184869 | Date: | 14.06.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04H60/04 | [2010/19] | CPC: |
H04H60/04 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2017/24] |
Former [2010/19] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verarbeitung von Audiosignalen | [2010/19] | English: | Method and device for processing audio signals | [2010/19] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le traitement de signaux audio | [2010/19] | Examination procedure | 06.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.08.2010 | Examination requested [2010/38] | 21.02.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.05.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 02.05.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.05.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 21.02.2017 | Opposition(s) | 15.03.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 06.11.2008 | AT | 14.06.2017 | CY | 14.06.2017 | CZ | 14.06.2017 | DK | 14.06.2017 | EE | 14.06.2017 | ES | 14.06.2017 | FI | 14.06.2017 | HR | 14.06.2017 | IT | 14.06.2017 | LT | 14.06.2017 | LV | 14.06.2017 | MC | 14.06.2017 | NL | 14.06.2017 | PL | 14.06.2017 | PT | 14.06.2017 | RO | 14.06.2017 | SE | 14.06.2017 | SI | 14.06.2017 | SK | 14.06.2017 | TR | 14.06.2017 | BG | 14.09.2017 | NO | 14.09.2017 | GR | 15.09.2017 | IS | 14.10.2017 | IE | 06.11.2017 | LU | 06.11.2017 | MT | 06.11.2017 | BE | 30.11.2017 | CH | 30.11.2017 | FR | 30.11.2017 | LI | 30.11.2017 | [2020/27] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 06.11.2008 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
TR | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 06.11.2008 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CY | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 06.11.2008 | |
AT | 14.06.2017 | ||
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/49] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
BE | 30.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
FR | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/45] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
IE | 06.11.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
MT | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/39] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SI | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
LU | 06.11.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/33] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
MC | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
CH | 30.11.2017 | ||
LI | 30.11.2017 | ||
Former [2018/21] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
DK | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/11] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
IT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
PL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
IS | 14.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/10] | AT | 14.06.2017 | |
CZ | 14.06.2017 | ||
EE | 14.06.2017 | ||
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
RO | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
SK | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2018/09] | EE | 14.06.2017 | |
ES | 14.06.2017 | ||
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/52] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
NL | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
LV | 14.06.2017 | ||
SE | 14.06.2017 | ||
BG | 14.09.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | ||
Former [2017/49] | ES | 14.06.2017 | |
FI | 14.06.2017 | ||
HR | 14.06.2017 | ||
LT | 14.06.2017 | ||
NO | 14.09.2017 | ||
GR | 15.09.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2007043804 (FIBAEK TINO [AU]) [X] 1-13,15-23 * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0060] * * paragraph [0063] * * paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0082] * * paragraph [0089] * * paragraph [0094] * * paragraphs [0099] - [0104] * * paragraph [0110] * * paragraph [0113] * * paragraphs [0222] - [0227] * * paragraph [0250] * * paragraph [0255] * |