EP2065090 - Eddy current mill [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.10.2013 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.11.2013 [2013/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lehigh Technologies, Inc. 801 Laurel Oak Drive, Suite 708 Naples, FL 34108 / US | [2010/18] |
Former [2009/23] | For all designated states Microtec GmbH Boschstrasse 2 86399 Bobingen / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fischer, Josef Boschstrasse 4a 86399 Bobingen / DE | [2009/23] | Representative(s) | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstraße 4 68163 Mannheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Bösl, Raphael Konrad Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/23] | Munk, Ludwig Patentanwälte Munk Prinzregentenstraße 3 86150 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019573.8 | 08.11.2008 | [2009/23] | Priority number, date | DE20071057565 | 29.11.2007 Original published format: DE102007057565 | [2009/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2065090 | Date: | 03.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B02C13/16, B02C13/28 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
B02C13/28 (EP);
B02C13/16 (EP);
B02C13/282 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/23] | Title | German: | Wirbelstrommuehle | [2009/23] | English: | Eddy current mill | [2009/23] | French: | Moulin à courant de Foucault | [2009/23] | Examination procedure | 08.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/34] | 07.08.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.02.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.03.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.06.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/46] | 09.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/46] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.08.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [DXY]DE9313930U (KOHLHAAS & KRAUS INGENIEURGESE [DE]) [DX] 1-4 * page 4; figures 1,3,4 * [Y] 5-7; | [DY]EP0787528 (FISCHER JOSEF [DE]) [DY] 5,6 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]JPS52112858 (KUBOTA LTD) [Y] 7 * figure 2 *; | [Y]DE438027 (SCHLEIFENBAUM & CIE G M B H GE) [Y] 7 * figure 2 * | by applicant | DE9313930U | EP0787528 | DE19962049 | DE2353907 | EP1413357 |