EP2124494 - Method and related apparatus for performing status report procedure in a wireless communication system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.04.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.04.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.05.2012 [2012/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HTC Corporation No. 23, Xinghua Rd. Taoyuan City Taoyuan County / TW | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Wu, Chih-Hsiang No. 23, Xinghua Road Taoyuan City Taoyuan County / TW | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/07] | Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/48] | Schaeberle, Steffen Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019634.8 | 10.11.2008 | [2009/48] | Priority number, date | US20080123466 | 20.05.2008 Original published format: US 123466 | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2124494 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/48] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2124494 | Date: | 30.06.2010 | [2010/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | H04W28/06 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
H04W28/06 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | Verfahren und entsprechende Vorrichtung zur Durchführung von Statusberichtsverfahren in einem drahtlosen Kommunikationssystem | [2009/48] | English: | Method and related apparatus for performing status report procedure in a wireless communication system | [2009/48] | French: | Procédé et appareil associé pour effectuer une procédure de rapport d'état dans un système de communication sans fil | [2009/48] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/13] | 30.12.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.11.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/21] | 02.01.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/21] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.07.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2011 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2006104344 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-15 * page 14, line 8 - page 15, line 7 * * page 20, line 11 - page 25, line 3 * * figures 10-12 *; | [X] - 3GPP TS 25.322 V8.1.0 (2008-03), "3rd Generation Partnership Project;Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network;Radio Link Control (RLC) protocol specification(Release 8)", (200803), pages 1 - 89, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Specs/html-info/25322.htm, (20100517), XP002582646 [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [4.2.1.3.1] , [9.2.1.6] , [9.2.2.8] , [9.2.2.11.1] , [9.2.2.11.2] * * paragraph [11.5..2.1] * | by applicant | WO2006104344 |