EP2045415 - Scaffolding, podium or tribune with a scaffolding base [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.01.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 17.09.2014 [2014/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wilhelm Layher Verwaltungs-GmbH Ochsenbacher Strasse 56 74363 Güglingen-Eibensbach / DE | [2009/15] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
* * * | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Clemens, Gerhard Patentanwaltskanzlei Müller, Clemens & Hach Lerchenstrasse 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/15] | Clemens, Gerhard Lerchenstraße 56 74074 Heilbronn / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019716.3 | 08.10.2003 | [2009/15] | Priority number, date | DE2002154033 | 20.11.2002 Original published format: DE 10254033 | [2009/15] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2045415 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2045415 | Date: | 16.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/11] | Type: | B9 Corrected patent specification | No.: | EP2045415 | Date: | 07.09.2011 | [2011/36] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04G1/15 | [2009/15] | CPC: |
E04H3/24 (EP);
E04G1/15 (EP);
E04G1/152 (EP);
E04G1/153 (EP);
E04G21/166 (EP);
E04G5/003 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | Gerüst, Podium oder Tribüne mit einem Gerüstboden | [2009/15] | English: | Scaffolding, podium or tribune with a scaffolding base | [2009/15] | French: | Echafaudage, podium ou tribune dotés d'un plancher d'échafaudage | [2009/15] | Examination procedure | 30.09.2009 | Examination requested [2009/46] | 26.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 11.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03022475.2 / EP1426523 | Opposition(s) | 19.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/08] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 06.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 18.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.03.2011 | CZ | 16.03.2011 | DK | 16.03.2011 | EE | 16.03.2011 | FI | 16.03.2011 | GR | 16.03.2011 | HU | 16.03.2011 | IE | 16.03.2011 | RO | 16.03.2011 | SI | 16.03.2011 | SK | 16.03.2011 | TR | 16.03.2011 | BG | 16.06.2011 | PT | 18.07.2011 | AT | 08.10.2011 | LU | 08.10.2011 | BE | 31.10.2011 | MC | 31.10.2011 | [2014/38] |
Former [2013/45] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
HU | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
AT | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/44] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
TR | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
AT | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
AT | 08.10.2011 | ||
LU | 08.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2013/07] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
AT | 08.10.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
BE | 31.10.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/25] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
MC | 31.10.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
DK | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
CZ | 16.03.2011 | ||
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
RO | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SK | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
EE | 16.03.2011 | ||
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
IE | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | ||
PT | 18.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 16.03.2011 | |
FI | 16.03.2011 | ||
SI | 16.03.2011 | ||
BG | 16.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE1559034 (MEISCH HANS) [X] 1,2,6,7,13-15 * page 12, lines 5-12; figure 1 * * page 6, lines 5-20 * * page 11; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US4984654 (ANDERSON CARL [US]) [A] 1 * column 4, lines 4-68; figure 1 *; | [A]DE19515062 (LANGER RUTH GEB LAYHER [DE]) [A] 1* column 9, line 46 - column 10, line 17; figure 5.1 * | by applicant | DE1559034 | US4984654 | DE19515062 |