EP2039323 - Disposable delivery device for endoluminal prosthesis [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.03.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.04.2012 [2012/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medtronic, Inc. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55342-5604 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | For all designated states Medtronic, INC. 710 Medtronic Parkway NE Minneapolis, MN 55342-5604 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Olson, Steve L. 1229 W. Knickerbocker Drive Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | 02 /
Davis, Glenn R. 1330 Cordilleras Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | [2009/15] |
Former [2009/13] | 01 /
Olson, Steve L. 10388 Byrne Avenue Cupertino, CA 95014 / US | ||
02 /
Davis, Glenn R. 1330 Cordilleras Avenue Sunnyvale, CA 94087 / US | Representative(s) | Henseler, Daniela Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte Postfach 14 04 43 40074 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/13] | Henseler, Daniela Rethelstrasse 123 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 08019995.3 | 23.07.1998 | [2009/13] | Priority number, date | US19970898997 | 24.07.1997 Original published format: US 898997 | [2009/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2039323 | Date: | 25.03.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/06 | [2009/13] | CPC: |
A61F2/966 (EP,US);
A61F2/95 (EP,US);
A61F2/9517 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, LI, NL [2009/13] | Title | German: | Einwegabgabevorrichtung für endoluminale Prothese | [2009/13] | English: | Disposable delivery device for endoluminal prosthesis | [2009/13] | French: | Dispositif de livraison jetable pour prothèse endoluminaire | [2009/13] | Examination procedure | 17.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/13] | 25.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.07.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 08.10.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/14] | 15.11.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2012/14] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04030603.7 / EP1518516 | EP98937927.6 / EP0935447 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP19980937927) is 16.09.2003 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 17.11.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 21.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 12   M06   Fee paid on   21.08.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0627201 (SCHNEIDER EUROP AG [CH]) [A] 1-12 * column 4, line 3 - column 4, line 5; figure 4 *; | [A]US5395349 (QUIACHON DINAH B [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 5, line 60 - column 7, line 50 *; | [X]EP0696447 (CARDIOVASCULAR CONCEPTS INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * column 24, line 53 - column 25, line 25; figures 25,30,40-42 *; | [A]US5634928 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al) [A] 1-12* column 3, line 66 - column 5, line 19 * | by applicant | US4512338 | US4651738 | US4665918 | US4990151 | US5035706 | US5092877 | US5104399 | EP0505686 | EP0508473 | EP0518839 | US5190058 | US5201757 | EP0539237 | US5242399 | US5275622 | US5282824 | US5433723 | US5443477 | US5458615 | US5480423 | US5484418 | US5489295 | US19950475200 | US19960628797 | US19960704960 | US19960744659 |