EP2078790 - Gabion for stone filling [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 22.01.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 24.02.2010 [2010/08] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nophadrain BV Mercuriusstraat 10 6468 ER Kerkrade / DE | [2009/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Zühlke, Holger Schwertlacke 36 59425 Unna / DE | [2009/29] | Representative(s) | Meinke, Dabringhaus und Partner GbR Rosa-Luxemburg-Strasse 18 44141 Dortmund / DE | [2009/29] | Application number, filing date | 08020045.4 | 18.11.2008 | [2009/29] | Priority number, date | DE20082000245U | 08.01.2008 Original published format: DE 202008000245 U | [2009/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2078790 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E02D29/02 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
E02D29/0208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Korb zur Aufnahme von Steinfüllungen | [2009/29] | English: | Gabion for stone filling | [2009/29] | French: | Gabion à remplir de pierres | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 12.01.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/08] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JPS6458708 (KYOSEI GIJUTSU KAIHATSU KIKO K; SABOU JISUBERI GIJUTSU CENTER) [X] 1,5,8,10 * abstract * [Y] 2,7,9; | [X]JP2001303577 (NISHIMATSU CONSTR CO LTD) [X] 1,4,5,8 * figure 1 *; | [X]JPH08105027 (NIKKEN METAL KK) [X] 1,3,4,8 * abstract *; | [XY]JPS58101932 (YAMAMOTO KYOSHI) [X] 6,8 * figure 3 * [Y] 2,7; | [X]JP2003328335 (TOO GIKEN KK) [X] 6,8 * figure 2 *; | [Y]JPH07119165 (KYOKADO ENG CO) [Y] 2,7 * figures 6a,6b *; | [Y]DE202007003515U (SCHMAUSER WOLFGANG [DE]) [Y] 9 * figure 2 *; | [A]JP2002371533 (JAPAN PATENT MAN KK) [A] 4,10 * figure 5 * |