EP2081118 - Document analysis, commenting, and reporting system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 17.05.2019 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2019 | Refusal of application | published on 19.06.2019 [2019/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2011/16] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services Limited 3 Grand Canal Plaza Grand Canal Street Upper Dublin 4 / IE | ||
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Accenture Global Services GmbH Herrenacker 15 8200 Schaffhausen / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Verma, Kunal 600 Park View Drive Apt 302 Santa Clara California, 94303 / US | 02 /
Kass, Alex 711 Coastland Drive Palo Alto California, 94303 / US | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte Grafinger Strasse 2 81671 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020182.5 | 19.11.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | US20070945958 | 27.11.2007 Original published format: US 945958 | US20080121503 | 15.05.2008 Original published format: US 121503 | [2009/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2081118 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/30] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2081118 | Date: | 02.12.2009 | [2009/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06F17/27 | [2009/37] | CPC: |
G06F8/10 (EP,US);
G06F16/36 (EP,US);
G06F16/93 (EP,US);
G06F40/143 (EP,US);
G06F40/253 (EP,US);
G06F40/284 (EP,US);
G06F40/289 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/30] | G06F17/27, G06F17/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | Dokumentenanalyse, Kommentierungs- und Meldesystem | [2009/30] | English: | Document analysis, commenting, and reporting system | [2009/30] | French: | Analyse de document, système de commentaire et de rapport | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 27.05.2010 | Examination requested [2010/28] | 25.06.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.03.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.01.2019 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 31.01.2019 | 31.01.2019 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.02.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2019/25] | 16.02.2019 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2019/25] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.06.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.11.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 13.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6139201 (CARBONELL JAIME G [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 35 - line 47 * * column 18, line 63 - column 25, line 46; figures 1,6,7 *; | [A]US2006265646 (GIROLAMI ROSE LAURA L [US]) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0059]; figures 1-3 *; | [X] - GIUSEPPE LAMI, "QuARS: A Tool for Analyzing Requirements", TECHNICAL REPORT CMU/SEI-2005-TR-014ESC-TR-2005-014, Carnegie Mellon SOftware Engineering Institute, (200509), URL: http://handle.dtic.mil/100.2/ADA441307, (20090730), XP002539468 [X] 1-10 * page 1 - page 23 * | [T] - PRATEEK JAIN, KUNAL VERMA, ALEX KASS, REYMONROD G. VASQUEZ, "Automated review of natural language requirements documents: generating useful warnings with user-extensible glossaries driving a simple state machine", PROCEEDING OF THE 2ND ANNUAL CONFERENCE ON INDIA SOFTWARE ENGINEERING CONFERENCE, Pune, India, (20090223), pages 37 - 46, XP002539469 [T] 1-10 * the whole document * | Examination | - David Hay ET AL, "Defining Business Rules - What are they really?", (20000701), URL: http://www.businessrulesgroup.org/first_paper/BRG-whatisBR_3ed.pdf, (20121123), XP055045464 |