EP2072647 - Draft roller [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.09.2016 [2016/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Murata Machinery, Ltd. 3, Minami Ochiai-cho Kisshoin Minami-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 601-8326 / JP | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ota, Naritoshi Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | 02 /
Sakamoto, Naotaka Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | [2015/40] |
Former [2009/26] | 01 /
Ota, Naritoshi Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | ||
02 /
Sakamoto, Naotaka Murata Machinery, Ltd. 136 Takeda Mukaishiro-cho Fushimi-ku Kyoto-shi Kyoto 612-8686 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/40] |
Former [2009/26] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020233.6 | 20.11.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | JP20070330694 | 21.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007330694 | [2009/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2072647 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2072647 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | [2011/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2072647 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2011 | Classification | IPC: | D01H5/74, D01H5/78 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
D01H5/78 (EP);
D01H5/74 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | CH, CZ, DE, LI, TR [2012/03] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Streckwerkwalze | [2009/26] | English: | Draft roller | [2009/26] | French: | Cylindre d'étirage | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 16.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.06.2011 | Examination requested [2011/30] | 16.08.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 14.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.12.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 28.05.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 19.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 16.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US41333 (WIELD, WILLIAM) [I] 1-4 * page 1; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [AP]DE202008011264U (RIETER INGOLSTADT GMBH [DE]) [AP] 1-4 * paragraphs [0002] , [0032] - [0041]; figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1693491 (MURATA MACHINERY LTD [JP]) [A] 1-4 * paragraphs [0008] - [0050]; figure 3 *; | [A]DE2930587 (TASCHKENTSKOE SP K BJURO TEKST) [A] 1-4 * page 9, paragraph l - page 10, paragraph 1; figures 3,4 *; | [A]EP0712948 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [AD]JPH03124820 (TORAY ENG CO LTD) [AD] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | JPH03124820 |