EP2063508 - Spark plug for internal combustion engine and method for producing the spark plug [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 27.02.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.04.2015 [2015/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | [2009/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kameda, Hiroyuki c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 02 /
Nakayama, Katsutoshi c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | 03 /
Nagasawa, Satoshi c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | [2014/17] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
Kameda, Hiroyuki c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | ||
02 /
Nakayama, Katsutoshi c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | |||
03 /
Nagasawa, Satoshi c/o NGK Spark Plug Co., Ltd. 14-18, Takatsuji-cho Mizuho-ku Nagoya-shi Aichi 467-8525 / JP | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/17] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020257.5 | 20.11.2008 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | JP20070300824 | 20.11.2007 Original published format: JP 2007300824 | JP20070338712 | 28.12.2007 Original published format: JP 2007338712 | JP20080120065 | 02.05.2008 Original published format: JP 2008120065 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063508 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2063508 | Date: | 20.03.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2063508 | Date: | 23.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01T21/02, H01T13/32 | [2013/12] | CPC: |
H01T21/02 (EP,US);
H01T13/32 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | H01T13/39, H01T21/02 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR [2013/45] |
Former [2009/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Zündkerze für Verbrennungsmotoren und Verfahren zur Herstellung der Zündkerze | [2009/22] | English: | Spark plug for internal combustion engine and method for producing the spark plug | [2009/22] | French: | Bougie pour moteur à combustion interne et son procédé de fabrication | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 20.09.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.09.2013 | Examination requested [2013/45] | 21.09.2013 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 25.10.2013 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 05.11.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2013 | Opposition(s) | 26.01.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1244189 (NGK SPARK PLUG CO [JP]) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0032]; figures 4A-4C *; | [XY]US2005062385 (NAKAMURA TOSHIYA [JP], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0072] - paragraph [0077]; figures 2, 3 * [Y] 15; | [XP]WO2007149862 (FEDERAL MOGUL CORP [US], et al) [XP] 1,15* claim 1 * | by applicant | JP2007338712 | JPS6145583 | JP2007300824 | JP2008120065 |