EP2189372 - Method and system for passenger seat belt verification [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.04.2013 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | [2010/41] |
Former [2010/21] | For all designated states Deutsche Telekom AG Friedrich-Ebert-Allee 140 53113 Bonn / DE | ||
For all designated states Technische Universität Berlin Strasse des 17. Juni 135 10623 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Krishnamurthy, Sudha, Dr. Bismarckstrasse 90 10627 Berlin / DE | [2010/21] | Representative(s) | Blumbach · Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/24] | Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2010/21] | Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020290.6 | 21.11.2008 | [2010/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2189372 | Date: | 26.05.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2189372 | Date: | 13.06.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B64D11/00, B64D25/06, B60R22/48 | [2010/21] | CPC: |
B64D25/06 (EP,US);
B60R22/48 (EP,US);
B64D11/0015 (EP);
B64D11/00155 (US);
B64D11/062 (EP);
B60R2022/4816 (EP,US);
B60R2022/4866 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Überwachung von Fluggast-Sicherheitsgurten | [2010/21] | English: | Method and system for passenger seat belt verification | [2010/21] | French: | Procédé et système de vérification des ceintures de sécurité pour passagers | [2010/21] | Examination procedure | 12.11.2010 | Examination requested [2010/52] | 29.12.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.12.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.04.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 20.04.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.12.2010 | Opposition(s) | 14.03.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 21.11.2008 | AT | 13.06.2012 | BE | 13.06.2012 | CY | 13.06.2012 | CZ | 13.06.2012 | DK | 13.06.2012 | EE | 13.06.2012 | FI | 13.06.2012 | HR | 13.06.2012 | IT | 13.06.2012 | LT | 13.06.2012 | LV | 13.06.2012 | MT | 13.06.2012 | NL | 13.06.2012 | PL | 13.06.2012 | RO | 13.06.2012 | SE | 13.06.2012 | SI | 13.06.2012 | SK | 13.06.2012 | TR | 13.06.2012 | BG | 13.09.2012 | NO | 13.09.2012 | GR | 14.09.2012 | ES | 24.09.2012 | IS | 13.10.2012 | PT | 15.10.2012 | GB | 21.11.2012 | IE | 21.11.2012 | LU | 21.11.2012 | CH | 30.11.2012 | FR | 30.11.2012 | LI | 30.11.2012 | MC | 30.11.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/27] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
GB | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 21.11.2012 | ||
LU | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2014/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
TR | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
GB | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
MC | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
MT | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
GB | 21.11.2012 | ||
IE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/50] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
FR | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/47] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
IE | 21.11.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/34] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
BG | 13.09.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
CH | 30.11.2012 | ||
LI | 30.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
ES | 24.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
DK | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
NL | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
PT | 15.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
IT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
PL | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
CZ | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
RO | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
SK | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
IS | 13.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
EE | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 13.06.2012 | |
BE | 13.06.2012 | ||
CY | 13.06.2012 | ||
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/51] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
SI | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
HR | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
LV | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
GR | 14.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 13.06.2012 | |
FI | 13.06.2012 | ||
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | FI | 13.06.2012 | |
LT | 13.06.2012 | ||
SE | 13.06.2012 | ||
NO | 13.09.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | LT | 13.06.2012 | |
NO | 13.09.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO9829283 (VOLVO AB [SE], et al) [X] 16 * page 6, line 20 - page 7, line 11 * * page 8, line 11 - page 9, line 30 * * page 11, line 10 - line 15; figure 1 * [Y] 1-9,11-15; | [Y]US2005061568 (SCHONDORF STEVEN YELLIN [US], et al) [Y] 1-8,11-14 * paragraphs [0011] , [0012] , [0019] - [0023] - [0025] - [0027] - [0029] - [0036]; figures 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0279608 (SONY CORP [JP]) [Y] 9 * page 5, lines 41-43; figure 9 * * page 6, line 58 - page 7, line 51 *; | [YA]US2004066287 (BREED DAVID S [US], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraphs [0050] , [0135] * [A] 1-4,11,12; | [A]US2008068220 (GIESA HANS-GERHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0016] , [0017] , [0024] , [0025] , [0033] - [0037] - [0054] *; | [A]WO2005030523 (INTELLIGENT MECHATRONIC SYS [CA], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0002] , [0008] - [0013]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP1588908 (IEE SARL [LU]) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]DE102004025319 (AIRBUS GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-16 * the whole document * | by applicant | US6002325 | US2005061568 | WO9829283 | EP0279608 | US2004066287 |