EP2080587 - Method and device for grinding gear wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.06.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.06.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.07.2010 [2010/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Höfler Maschinenbau GmbH Industriestrasse 19 76275 Ettlingen / DE | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Geiser, Hansjörg, Dr.-Ing. Oberer Rain 14 76571 Gaggenau-Ottenau / DE | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Mischung, Ralf Eder Schieschke & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Elisabethstrasse 34/II 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/30] | Mischung, Ralf Patentanwälte Eder & Schieschke Elisabethstrasse 34 80796 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08020967.9 | 03.12.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | DE20082000645U | 16.01.2008 Original published format: DE 202008000645 U | DE20081019074 | 15.04.2008 Original published format: DE102008019074 | [2009/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080587 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.05.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B24B19/00, B23F1/02 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
B23Q11/10 (EP);
B23F1/02 (EP);
B23F23/00 (EP);
B24B19/009 (EP);
B24B19/02 (EP);
B24B55/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | (deleted) [2010/13] |
Former [2009/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Zahnradschleifen | [2009/30] | English: | Method and device for grinding gear wheels | [2009/30] | French: | Procédé et dispositif pour le meulage de roues dentées | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 23.01.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/29] | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2010/29] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1870202 (GLEASON WORKS [US]) [A] 1-13 * paragraphs [0031] , [0034]; figures 1,2 *; | [PA]EP1955812 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [PA] 1-13 * paragraph [0022] * | by applicant | CH630832 | DE19626879 |