EP2063073 - Working fluids for thermal energy conversion of waste heat form fuel cells using rankine cycle systems [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Singh, Rajiv R 18 Foxfire Drive Getzville NY 14068 / US | 02 /
Wilson, David P 118 Waxwing Court East Amherst NY 14051 / US | 03 /
Hulse, Ryan 220 Stuewe Road Getzville NY 14068 / US | 04 /
Zyhowski, Gary J 26 Running Brook Drive Lancaster NY 14086 / US | [2009/22] | Representative(s) | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/39] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/47] | Clarke, Lionel Paul, et al Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | ||
Former [2009/22] | Hucker, Charlotte Jane Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street London EC2M 7LH / GB | Application number, filing date | 08021129.5 | 18.07.2005 | [2009/22] | Priority number, date | US20040892913 | 16.07.2004 Original published format: US 892913 | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2063073 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2063073 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F01K25/08, C09K5/04, H01M8/00 | [2009/22] | CPC: |
H01M8/04029 (EP,US);
C09K5/04 (KR);
C09K5/045 (EP,US);
F01K25/08 (EP,KR,US);
F25B9/00 (KR);
H01M8/04022 (EP,US);
H01M2250/405 (EP,US);
Y02B90/10 (EP,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP);
Y02P20/10 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | [2014/35] |
Former [2009/22] | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT | Title | German: | Arbeitsmittel zur thermalen Energieumwandlung von Abwärme aus Brennstoffzellen unter Verwendung von Rankine-Zyklussystemen | [2009/22] | English: | Working fluids for thermal energy conversion of waste heat form fuel cells using rankine cycle systems | [2009/22] | French: | Fluides de travail pour la conversion d'énergie thermique des piles à combustible sous forme de chaleur de déchets | [2009/22] | Examination procedure | 19.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/51] | 29.07.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/51] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05774740.4 / EP1773962 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050774740) is 19.12.2007 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.07.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 08.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2014 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPS55131096 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1,3,4 * abstract * [I] 5-11; | [XI]US5653908 (MINOR BARBARA HAVILAND [US]) [X] 1,3,11 * column 2, lines 11-67 *[I] 4-10; | [XI]WO9731989 (DU PONT [US]) [X] 1,3,11 * page 2, line 22 - page 3, line 6 * [I] 4-10 | by applicant | US4442676 | US4465610 | US4736045 | US4876855 | US5705716 | US6076355 | US6365289 | US6374907 | - LEE, B. I.; KESLER, M. G., AICHE J., (1975), vol. 21, page 510 | - S6MER, M.; STR6M, CAN. J. CHEM. ENG., (1995), vol. 73, page 854 | - JOBACK, K. G.; REID R. C., CHEM. ENG. COMM., (1987), vol. 57, page 233 | - RIEDEL, L, CHEM. ING. TECH., (1954), vol. 26, page 679 | US20040790303 | US20040892913 |