EP2072683 - Device for processing a stay cable of a cable-stayed bridge [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.01.2012 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vecchi, Marcel Gasteiner Strasse 25 47249 Duisburg / DE | [2009/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/26] | Representative(s) | Demski, Siegfried, et al Demski & Nobbe Patentanwälte Mülheimer Strasse 210 47057 Duisburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/26] | Demski, Siegfried, et al Demski, Frank & Nobbe Patentanwälte Tonhallenstrasse 16 47051 Duisburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021256.6 | 08.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | DE20071059235 | 17.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007059235 | [2009/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072683 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2072683 | Date: | 09.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E01D19/10 | [2009/26] | CPC: |
E01D19/106 (EP);
E01D19/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Bearbeitung eines Schrägseils einer Schrägseilbrücke | [2009/26] | English: | Device for processing a stay cable of a cable-stayed bridge | [2009/26] | French: | Dispositif destiné au traitement d'un hauban d'un pont haubané | [2009/26] | Examination procedure | 14.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 21.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.01.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 09.03.2011 | CZ | 09.03.2011 | DK | 09.03.2011 | EE | 09.03.2011 | FI | 09.03.2011 | HR | 09.03.2011 | HU | 09.03.2011 | IE | 09.03.2011 | IT | 09.03.2011 | LT | 09.03.2011 | LV | 09.03.2011 | MT | 09.03.2011 | NL | 09.03.2011 | PL | 09.03.2011 | RO | 09.03.2011 | SE | 09.03.2011 | SI | 09.03.2011 | SK | 09.03.2011 | TR | 09.03.2011 | BG | 09.06.2011 | NO | 09.06.2011 | GR | 10.06.2011 | ES | 20.06.2011 | IS | 09.07.2011 | PT | 11.07.2011 | LU | 08.12.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
TR | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
LU | 08.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
MT | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/24] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
IT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
DK | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
PL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
IS | 09.07.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
PL | 20.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
CZ | 09.03.2011 | ||
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
RO | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
SK | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
EE | 09.03.2011 | ||
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
IE | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
PT | 11.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
NL | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 09.03.2011 | |
FI | 09.03.2011 | ||
HR | 09.03.2011 | ||
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
SI | 09.03.2011 | ||
BG | 09.06.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 09.03.2011 | |
LT | 09.03.2011 | ||
LV | 09.03.2011 | ||
SE | 09.03.2011 | ||
NO | 09.06.2011 | ||
GR | 10.06.2011 | ||
ES | 20.06.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE3641778 (GRASSL MANFRED DIPL-ING, et al) [X] 1-15 * column 5, line 53 - column 6, line 26 * * column 7, line 4 - line 10; figures 1-5 *; | [A]WO2005090685 (SONNEN KLAUS [DE]) [A] 2-8* page 6, line 14 - page 7, line 18; figure - * | by applicant | DE3641778 |