blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2071082

EP2071082 - Retaining element for vehicles with wheels [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.05.2015
Database last updated on 09.05.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip01.05.2015Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 03.06.2015  [2015/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH
Heinrich-Ehrhardt-Strasse 2
29345 Unterlüß / DE
[2013/49]
Former [2009/25]For all designated states
Rheinmetall Landsysteme GmbH
Dr.-Hell-Strasse
24107 Kiel / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Grosch, Hermann, Dr.
Im Ölfeld 5
29336 Nienhagen / DE
 [2009/25]
Representative(s)Dietrich, Barbara
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Derendorfer Allee 6
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/25]Dietrich, Barbara
Thul Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Rheinmetall Platz 1
40476 Düsseldorf / DE
Application number, filing date08021408.310.12.2008
[2009/25]
Priority number, dateDE2007106050615.12.2007         Original published format: DE102007060506
[2009/25]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2071082
Date:17.06.2009
Language:DE
[2009/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP2071082
Date:11.07.2012
Language:DE
[2012/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.06.2012
ClassificationIPC:E01F13/12, F41H11/08
[2012/28]
CPC:
E01F13/12 (EP,US); F41H11/08 (EP,US)
Former IPC [2009/25]E01F13/12
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   NO,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/25]
TitleGerman:Sperrkörper gegen Räder aufweisende Fahrzeuge[2009/25]
English:Retaining element for vehicles with wheels[2009/25]
French:Dispositif de retenue contre les véhicules à roues[2009/25]
Examination procedure11.01.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
11.01.2013Examination requested  [2013/09]
25.07.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.12.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2015/23]
13.01.2015Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [2015/23]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  25.07.2014
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201407   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]GB577929  (RENDAN HOLDINGS LTD, et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US883494  (SHIRAMINE KAZUMA [CA]) [A] 1-5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US5921703  (BECKER JONATHAN B [US], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-11 *;
 [AP]DE102007025480  (BUNDESREP DEUTSCHLAND [DE]) [AP] 1,2,4 * the whole document *
by applicantDE19509404
 GB577929
 US2346713
 DE646750
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.