EP2070864 - Method for operating an industrial truck [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.01.2012 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.02.2012 [2012/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jungheinrich Aktiengesellschaft Am Stadtrand 35 22047 Hamburg / DE | [2009/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schöttke, Carsten Am Mühlbachbogen 43c 85368 Moosburg / DE | [2011/07] |
Former [2009/25] | 01 /
Schötte, Carsten Am Mühlbachbogen 43c 85368 Moosburg / DE | Representative(s) | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/25] | Tiesmeyer, Johannes, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021542.9 | 11.12.2008 | [2009/25] | Priority number, date | DE20071060433 | 14.12.2007 Original published format: DE102007060433 | DE20082005966U | 30.04.2008 Original published format: DE 202008005966 U | [2009/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2070864 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2070864 | Date: | 09.12.2009 | [2009/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2070864 | Date: | 02.03.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/09] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.11.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B66F17/00 | [2009/25] | CPC: |
B66F17/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, SE [2010/33] |
Former [2009/25] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Betrieb eines Flurförderzeugs | [2009/25] | English: | Method for operating an industrial truck | [2009/25] | French: | Procédé destiné au fonctionnement d'un chariot de manutention | [2009/25] | Examination procedure | 21.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/09] | 10.06.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.07.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SI, SK, TR | 06.10.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.01.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 07.01.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.12.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0814051 (STILL WAGNER GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [AD] 1-19 * abstract *; | [AD]DE19919655 (JUNGHEINRICH AG [DE]) [AD] 1-19 * abstract *; | [AD]EP0343839 (RAYMOND CORP [US]) [AD] 1-19 * abstract *; | [A]GB2412902 (LINDE AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0814051 | EP0343839 | DE19919655 |