EP2080852 - Scaffolding lining with access way flap with a limited rotation angle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.05.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 07.10.2015 [2015/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ASB Produktions GmbH Langhennersdorfer Strasse 15 09603 Grossschirma / DE | [2013/27] |
Former [2009/30] | For all designated states Weiss, Johannes Auf dem Feldgut 1 09603 Grossschirma / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Erich, Albert Schuberstrasse 49 63768 Hösbach / DE | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Pöhner Scharfenberger & Partner Kaiserstrasse 33 Postfach 6323 97013 Würzburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/27] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton Patentanwalt Postfach 6323 97070 Würzburg / DE | ||
Former [2009/30] | Pöhner, Wilfried Anton, Dr. Patentanwalt Postfach 6323 97070 Würzburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021687.2 | 13.12.2008 | [2009/30] | Priority number, date | DE20081005182 | 19.01.2008 Original published format: DE102008005182 | [2009/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2080852 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2080852 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E04G1/15, E05D11/06 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
E04G1/15 (EP);
E05D11/06 (EP);
E04G2001/155 (EP);
E05D3/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Extension states | AL | 29.10.2009 | BA | 29.10.2009 | MK | 29.10.2009 | RS | 29.10.2009 | Title | German: | Gerüstbelag mit Durchstiegsklappe, deren Schwenkwinkel begrenzt ist | [2009/30] | English: | Scaffolding lining with access way flap with a limited rotation angle | [2009/30] | French: | Plateforme d'échafaudage dotée d'un clapet de passage dont l'angle de pivotement est limité | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 28.10.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/50] | 26.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 04.04.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2012 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   14.02.2013 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.12.2008 | BG | 03.07.2013 | CY | 03.07.2013 | EE | 03.07.2013 | HR | 03.07.2013 | IT | 03.07.2013 | LT | 03.07.2013 | LV | 03.07.2013 | MT | 03.07.2013 | NL | 03.07.2013 | PL | 03.07.2013 | RO | 03.07.2013 | SI | 03.07.2013 | SK | 03.07.2013 | TR | 03.07.2013 | NO | 03.10.2013 | GR | 04.10.2013 | ES | 14.10.2013 | IS | 03.11.2013 | PT | 04.11.2013 | IE | 13.12.2013 | [2015/41] |
Former [2015/34] | HU | 13.12.2008 | |
BG | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 03.07.2013 | ||
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
Former [2015/32] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
TR | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
IE | 13.12.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
IT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/23] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
EE | 03.07.2013 | ||
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
SK | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/22] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
RO | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/18] | CY | 03.07.2013 | |
HR | 03.07.2013 | ||
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
NL | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
LV | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
GR | 04.10.2013 | ||
ES | 14.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
PL | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
CY | 31.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
IS | 03.11.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | HR | 03.07.2013 | |
LT | 03.07.2013 | ||
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 03.07.2013 | |
SI | 03.07.2013 | ||
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
PT | 04.11.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | SI | 03.07.2013 | |
NO | 03.10.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | SI | 03.07.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US1769553 (TANGENBERG EDWARD A) [Y] 1,5 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1854940 (WUI LOONG SCAFFOLDING WORKS CO [CN]) [Y] 1,5 * abstract *; | [A]FR2699217 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]GB191415283 (CROFTS ALBAN, et al) [A] 1 * page 3, lines 8-47; figure - *; | [A]US2158257 (SHEEHE ROBERT E) [A] 1 * the whole document * | by applicant | JP2003105967 | US1769553 |