EP2106122 - Motion estimating device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hirayama, Keiko c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Yamauchi, Himio c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | [2012/10] |
Former [2009/40] | 01 /
Hirayama, Keiko c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Yamauchi, Himio c/o Intellectual Property Division Toshiba Corporation 1-1 Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/04] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/40] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08021746.6 | 15.12.2008 | [2009/40] | Priority number, date | JP20080086890 | 28.03.2008 Original published format: JP 2008086890 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2106122 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2106122 | Date: | 22.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04N5/14, G06T7/20, H04N7/26 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
H04N5/144 (EP);
G06T7/231 (EP);
H04N19/51 (EP);
G06T2207/10016 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2010/22] |
Former [2009/40] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Bewegungsschätzungsvorrichtung | [2009/40] | English: | Motion estimating device | [2009/40] | French: | Dispositif d'évaluation des mouvements | [2009/40] | Examination procedure | 15.12.2008 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 20.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 06.05.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.11.2011 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 01.12.2011 | 01.12.2011 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 14.02.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 31.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 23.10.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2003190059 (PICCINELLI EMILIANO [IT], et al) [Y] 9 * abstract * * page 3, paragraph 58 - page 5, paragraph 97 *; | [Y]US2002114394 (MA KAI-KUANG [SG]) [Y] 1-9 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 49 - page 5, paragraph 72 *; | [Y]US2006088191 (ZHANG TONG [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * page 1, paragraph 5; figure 8 * * page 3, paragraph 33 - page 4, paragraph 48; claim 6 *; | [Y]US2005053291 (MISHIMA NAO [JP], et al) [Y] 7 * the whole document * | by applicant | US2003190059 | US2002114394 | US2006088191 | US2005053291 |