EP2072735 - Closure for a vehicle bay with a sliding mobile panel and concentric rails, and corresponding vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.03.2014 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.04.2014 [2014/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Advanced Comfort Systems France SAS - ACS France 5-7 rue du Moulin Jacquet Parc d'activité Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | [2010/42] |
Former [2010/10] | For all designated states Advanced Comfort Systems France - ACS France 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet Parc d'activité Moulin Jacquet 79300 Bressuire / FR | ||
Former [2009/26] | For all designated states Wagon SAS Parc d'Activité du Moulin Jacquet, 5-7, rue du Moulin Jacquet ZI No.2, BP 59 79302 Bressuire Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Defreitas, Sandra La petite Thuie 79250 Nueil Les Aubiers / FR | 02 /
Merlet, David 2, rue de Tempyre 85590 Saint-Maldo du Bois / FR | 03 /
Papon, Jean-Paul 31 rue de la Croix Verte Saint Porchaire 79300 Bressuire / FR | 04 /
Deborde, Laurent 10, rue Jacques Brel 49310 Vihiers / FR | 05 /
Giret, Frédéric 12, impasse de Bois d'Anne 79300 Bressuire / FR | 06 /
Sanchez, Luc 3 rue de la Croix de mission 86170 Cisse / FR | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/26] | 01 /
Defreitas, Sandra La petite Thuie 79250 Nueil Les Aubiers / FR | ||
02 /
Merlet, David 2, rue de Tempyre 85590 Saint-Maldo du Bois / FR | |||
03 /
Papon, Jean-Paul 31 rue de la Croix Verte Saint Porchaire 79300 Bressuire / FR | |||
04 /
Deborde, Laurent 10, rue Jacques Brei 49310 Vihiers / FR | |||
05 /
Giret, Frédéric 12, impasse de Bois d'Anne 79300 Bressuire / FR | |||
06 /
Sanchez, Luc 3 rue de la Croix de mission 86170 Cisse / FR | Representative(s) | Bioret, Ludovic Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16 B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Bioret, Ludovic Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16 B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | ||
Former [2009/26] | Bioret, Ludovic Cabinet Vidon Technopôle Atalante 16 B, rue de Jouanet 35703 Rennes Cedex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 08022009.8 | 18.12.2008 | [2009/26] | Priority number, date | FR20070059961 | 18.12.2007 Original published format: FR 0759961 | [2009/26] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2072735 | Date: | 24.06.2009 | Language: | FR | [2009/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2072735 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | E05F11/53, B60J1/14, E05F11/38 | [2013/08] | CPC: |
E05F11/535 (EP);
B60J1/14 (EP);
E05F11/382 (EP);
E05Y2201/684 (EP);
E05Y2800/266 (EP);
E05Y2900/55 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/26] | E05F11/38, E05F15/16, B60J1/14 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, TR [2010/09] |
Former [2009/26] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Schliesseinrichtung für eine Öffnung eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit einem beweglichen Schiebepaneel und konzentrischen Gleitschienen, und zugehöriges Kraftfahrzeug | [2013/08] | English: | Closure for a vehicle bay with a sliding mobile panel and concentric rails, and corresponding vehicle | [2009/26] | French: | Dispositif d'obturation d'une baie de véhicule automobile à panneau mobile coulissant et rails concentriques, et véhicule automobile correspondant | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/26] | Schliesseinrichtung für eine Öffnung eines Kraftfahrzeugs mit einem beweglichen Schiebepaneel und konzentrischen Gleitschienen, und zugehüriges Kraftfahrzeug | ||
Former [2009/26] | Dispositif d'obturation d'une baie de vehicule automobile a panneau mobile coulissant et rails concentriques, et vehicule automobile correspondant | Examination procedure | 26.11.2009 | Examination requested [2010/01] | 29.12.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 01.02.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK | 14.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 28.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.02.2013 | Opposition(s) | 18.02.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE202004015589U (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE [DE]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0063] - paragraph [0067]; figure 7; claim 1 *; | [A]US4615143 (ISETANI HIDEKI [JP]) [A] 1-15 * column 3, line 65 - column 7, line 15; figures 1-3; claim 1 *; | [A]FR2583003 (RENAULT VEHICULES IND [FR]) [A] 1-15 * page 3, line 5 - page 5, line 24; figures 1,2; claims 1-7 *; | [A]DE19853625 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-15 * column 2, line 48 - column 3, line 58; figures 1-7; claim 1 * | by applicant | EP0778168 | WO2008EP67264 |