EP2199600 - Tidal power generation device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.08.2013 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.10.2013 [2013/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lin, Tso-Tung No. 3 Lane 127 Sec. 1 Chung Cheng Road He He Li, Mei Nung Chen Kaohsiung Hsien / TW | [2010/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2010/25] | Representative(s) | Horak, Michael, et al Horak. Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Georgstraße 48 30159 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2012/19] | Horak, Michael, et al Horak Rechtsanwälte Georgstrasse 48 30159 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2011/26] | Horak, Michael Beukenberg Rechtsanwälte Uhlemeyerstrasse 9+11 30175 Hannover / DE | ||
Former [2010/25] | Horak, Michael Beukenberg Rechtsanwälte Roscherstrasse 12 30161 Hannover / DE | Application number, filing date | 08022181.5 | 19.12.2008 | [2010/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2199600 | Date: | 23.06.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.07.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F03B13/18, F03B13/26 | [2010/25] | CPC: |
F03B13/1855 (EP);
F05B2250/12 (EP);
F05B2250/221 (EP);
F05B2250/41 (EP);
Y02E10/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/25] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSNUTZUNG VON GEZEITENENERGIE | [2012/43] | English: | Tidal power generation device | [2010/25] | French: | Dispositif de génération d'énergie marémotrice | [2010/25] |
Former [2010/25] | Platinkomplexverbindungen und organische Elektrolumineszenzvorrichtung damit | Examination procedure | 19.12.2008 | Examination requested [2010/25] | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 23.11.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.04.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.10.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.02.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/40] | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2013/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.11.2010 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2179537 (ZOPPA ARTHUR E) [Y] 1-10 * page 2, line 59 - page 3, line 48; figures 1,4-6 *; | [Y]US1617568 (BLOSS WILLIAM G) [Y] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]GB238337 (SAMUEL BARTON CALDWELL) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 81 - page 3, line 22; figure 1 *; | [A]US4379235 (TREPL II JOHN A [US]) [A] 1-10 * column 2, line 6 - column 3, line 21; figures 1-5 *; | [A]US2008016863 (TAI CHUN-I [TW], et al) [A] 1-10 * abstract * * paragraphs [0024] - [0029]; figure 1 *; | [A]GB628422 (HERBERT HEATON PATRICK) [A] 1-10 * page 1, line 7 - page 2, line 16; figure 1 *; | [A]US4228360 (NAVARRO PABLO) [A] 1-10 * column 9, lines 8-33; figure 11 *; | [A]WO8100285 (Q CORP [US]) [A] 1-10 * page 14, line 24 - page 17, line 30; figures 7,11 * | by applicant | US2179537 | US1617568 |