14.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.12.2014 [2014/51] |
21.02.2014 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 26.03.2014 [2014/13] |
07.02.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.03.2014 [2014/11] |
15.03.2013 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 17.04.2013 [2013/16] |
13.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
13.03.2013 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
01.03.2013 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
15.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.11.2012 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
07.11.2012 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
26.10.2012 |
Change - inventor |
published on 28.11.2012 [2012/48] |
19.10.2012 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] |
12.10.2012 |
Change - German title |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
12.10.2012 |
Change - English title |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
12.10.2012 |
Change - French title |
published on 14.11.2012 [2012/46] |
21.09.2012 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 24.10.2012 [2012/43] |
14.09.2012 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
10.02.2012 |
Publication of search report |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
10.02.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
10.02.2012 |
Change - classification |
published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] |
10.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.08.2011 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.09.2011 [2011/37] |
12.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.05.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 01.07.2009 [2009/27] |