EP2081415 - Microcontroller-controlled emergency lighting assembly and communication network intended for this purpose [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RP-Technik e. K. Hermann Staudinger-Str. 10-12 63110 Rodgau / DE | [2009/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sezmener, Erol, Dipl.-Math. Praunheimer Landstr. 5 60488 Frankfurt/Main / DE | 02 /
Ranostaj, Frank, Dipl.-Phys. Kirschwäldchen 55 60437 Frankfurt/Main / DE | [2009/30] | Representative(s) | Cremer & Cremer Patentanwälte St.-Barbara-Strasse 16 89077 Ulm / DE | [2009/30] | Application number, filing date | 08075041.7 | 09.01.2008 | [2009/30] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2081415 | Date: | 22.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2081415 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | DE | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H05B37/02, H04L12/24 | [2009/30] | CPC: |
H04L67/025 (EP);
H05B47/175 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/30] | Title | German: | Mikrokontroller-gesteuerte Notlichtbeleuchtungsanlage und geeignetes Kommunikationsverfahren hierfür | [2009/30] | English: | Microcontroller-controlled emergency lighting assembly and communication network intended for this purpose | [2009/30] | French: | Installation d'éclairage d'urgence commandée par microcontrôleur et procédé de communication approprié | [2009/30] | Examination procedure | 21.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/30] | 27.07.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.11.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 28.11.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 28.04.2010 | DK | 28.04.2010 | EE | 28.04.2010 | FI | 28.04.2010 | HR | 28.04.2010 | HU | 28.04.2010 | IE | 28.04.2010 | IT | 28.04.2010 | LT | 28.04.2010 | LV | 28.04.2010 | MT | 28.04.2010 | NL | 28.04.2010 | PL | 28.04.2010 | PT | 28.04.2010 | RO | 28.04.2010 | SE | 28.04.2010 | SI | 28.04.2010 | SK | 28.04.2010 | TR | 28.04.2010 | CY | 16.06.2010 | BG | 28.07.2010 | NO | 28.07.2010 | GR | 29.07.2010 | ES | 08.08.2010 | IS | 28.08.2010 | LU | 09.01.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
HR | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
TR | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
NO | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
LU | 09.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
HR | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
BG | 28.07.2010 | ||
NO | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
LU | 09.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/32] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
HR | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PT | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
LU | 09.01.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
HR | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
LU | 09.01.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
HR | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
MT | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CZ | 28.04.2010 | |
DK | 28.04.2010 | ||
EE | 28.04.2010 | ||
FI | 28.04.2010 | ||
HR | 28.04.2010 | ||
IE | 28.04.2010 | ||
IT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LT | 28.04.2010 | ||
LV | 28.04.2010 | ||
NL | 28.04.2010 | ||
PL | 28.04.2010 | ||
RO | 28.04.2010 | ||
SE | 28.04.2010 | ||
SI | 28.04.2010 | ||
SK | 28.04.2010 | ||
CY | 16.06.2010 | ||
NO | 28.07.2010 | ||
GR | 29.07.2010 | ||
ES | 08.08.2010 | ||
IS | 28.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 28.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0193399 (ASTEC INT LTD [CN], et al) [A] 1,2,10 * abstract *; | [Y]US2003103075 (ROSSELOT ROBERT CHARLES [US]) [Y] 1 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0004]; figure 1 * * paragraph [0054] - paragraph [0055]; figure 19 *; | [YD]EP1513376 (CEAG NOTLICHTSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [YD] 1 * paragraph [0037] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1,2 *; | [A]US2005206241 (SAXENA PIYUSH [US], et al); | [AD]CN1987850 (TENGXUN SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY [CN]) [AD] 2,10 * abstract * | by applicant | EP1513376 | CN1987850 |